California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:23-bk-12060
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2023
Dismissed:Feb 12, 2025
Terminated:Mar 21, 2025

Debtor
Stewart Homes, Inc.
11810 Beach Blvd
Stanton, CA 90680-3610
Represented By
Stewart Homes, Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Debtor
27068 La Paz Road Suite 292
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656
Petitioning Creditor
Mobile Direct LLC, Petitioning Creditor
2000 Mallory Lane` Suite 290
Franklin, TN 37067
Represented By
William J Wall
Wall & Son
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Mobile Direct 2 LLC, Petitioning Creditor
2000 Mallory Lane Suite 290
Franklin, TN 37067
Represented By
William J Wall
Wall & Son
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 10/09/2023 7:02 AM PDT
Saturday, October 07, 2023
1 1 misc Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Official Form 105 or 205) Sat 10/07 5:13 PM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338 Re: Stewart Homes, Inc. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Debtor, Mobile Direct LLC, Mobile Direct 2 LLC (attorney William J Wall). (Wall, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Involuntary Summons Service Unexecuted Sat 10/07 5:44 PM
Summons Not Executed on Stewart Homes, Inc. Filed by Petitioning Creditor Mobile Direct LLC, Debtor Stewart Homes, Inc.. (Wall, William)
Related: [-]