Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-12060

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:24-ap-01019
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc.
Represented By
Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Craig Williams
Represented By
Craig Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
Stewart Homes, Inc.
Represented By
Mark D Hurwitz
contact info
Charity J Manee
Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP
contact info
Marc C Forsythe
Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP
contact info
Leo D Plotkin
Levy, Small & Lallas
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/11 4:03 PM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-1019 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (AM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
25 25 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 03/06 1:11 PM
Hearing Held Re:1 Pre-Trial Conference Re: Complaint - Off Calendar - Case Dismissed - Order Granting Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary With Prejudice Entered 1-23-25 - See Doc #23 (GD)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 25, 2025
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 23, 2025
23 23 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Thu 01/23 2:49 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary With Prejudice (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/23/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc.. IT IS ORDERED that the within adversary proceedings are dismissed with prejudice. (GD
22 22 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 01/23 9:21 AM
Stipulation By Craig Williams, Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc. and Stewart Homes, Inc. with Proof of Service Filed by Defendants Craig Williams, Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc. (Plazak, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
21 21 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 01/09 4:52 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc.
Thursday, October 24, 2024
20 20 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 10/24 2:47 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 1-09-25 At 10:00 A.M. Per Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Pre-Trial Conference Entered 10-17-24 - See Doc #18 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc.
Saturday, October 19, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 10/19 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, October 17, 2024
18 18 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Thu 10/17 11:33 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Pre-Trial Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pre-Trial Conference now set for October 24, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. is continued to January 9, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Signed on 10/17/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 10/16 1:27 PM
Stipulation By Craig Williams, Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc. and Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc. to Continue PreTrial Conference with Proof of Service Filed by Defendants Craig Williams, Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc. (Plazak, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 10/03 4:55 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to 10-24-24 at 10:00 A.M. Per Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference Entered 9-09-24 - See Doc #12 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc.
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 09/11 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 09/11 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 misc Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/09 12:39 PM
Notice to creditors Re: Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference (BNC-PDF) (GD)
Related: [-]
12 12 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/09 11:36 AM
Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - A Pre-Trial Conference is set for hearing on September 26, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. That hearing is continued to October 24, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Signed on 9/9/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] 1
Sunday, April 28, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/28 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 26, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Fri 04/26 5:13 PM
Status Conference And Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/26/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert Pre-Trial Order due by 9/12/2024. Discovery due by 8/31/2024. (GD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
9 9 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 04/25 3:19 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Deadline for completing discovery is August 31, 2024; Last date for filing pre-trial motions is on September 13, 2024; Pre-trial conference is on September 26, 2024 at 10:00 a.m.; Joint pre-trial stipulation and/or order due per local rules; Plaintiff's counsel to submit scheduling order. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc.
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
8 8 misc Status report Wed 04/10 12:43 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc. Related [+]. (Hurwitz, Mark)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
7 7 notice Notice Tue 03/12 7:24 AM
Notice of Errata with Proof of Service Filed by Defendants Craig Williams, Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc. Related [+]. (Plazak, Douglas)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint with Proof of Service Filed by Craig Williams, Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc.. (Plazak, Douglas) See docket entry no: 6 for corrective action. Modified on 3/11/2024 (SD8). filed by Defendant Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc., Defendant Craig Williams
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 03/11 2:10 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date/time/location was selected. Incorrect hearing date reflected. This matter is set for April 25, 2024 at 10:00 am THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc., Defendant Craig Williams
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/11 1:27 PM
Answer to Complaint with Proof of Service Filed by Craig Williams, Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc.. (Plazak, Douglas) See docket entry no: 6 for corrective action. Modified on 3/11/2024 (SD8)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/12 1:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Craig Williams 2/12/2024; Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc. 2/12/2024 (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Mon 02/12 1:55 PM
Notice of Early Meeting of Counsel Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 Filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc. Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:24-ap-01019. Complaint by Stewart Homes, Inc. against Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc., Craig Williams. ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc.
Thursday, February 08, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 02/08 5:02 PM
Summons Issued on Craig Williams Date Issued 2/8/2024, Answer Due 3/11/2024; Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc. Date Issued 2/8/2024, Answer Due 3/11/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 4/25/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stewart Homes, Inc.
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/08 12:30 PM
Adversary case 8:24-ap-01019. Complaint by Stewart Homes, Inc. against Williams Family Manufactured Homes, Inc., Craig Williams. ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Hurwitz, Mark)
Related: [-]