Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-04134
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2014
Terminated:Apr 07, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Sep 03, 2015 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Daniel James Northrop
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Blackman
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jason J. Mendro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/03/2015 5:04 AM EDT
Tuesday, November 04, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1362254] 14-4134 [Entered: 11/04/2014 04:38 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, district court docket entry re: receipt # 0208-10273434, FILED.[1362259] 14-4134 [Entered: 11/04/2014 04:40 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/03/2014, RECEIVED.[1362263] 14-4134 [Entered: 11/04/2014 04:42 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/03/2014, RECEIVED.[1362263] 14-4134 [Entered: 11/04/2014 04:42 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1362270] 14-4134 [Entered: 11/04/2014 04:45 PM]
Related: [-]