Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:23-bk-10852
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Dismissed:May 08, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Artisan's Cabinetry and Woodworks, LLC
2200 S Church St Ste 103
Georgetown, TX 78626-8093
Represented By
Kimberly L. Nash
Law Office Of Kimberly Nash P.C.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 07/02 8:33 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
123 123 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Rpt of No Distrib C - case dismissed or converted, fee award not recd Mon 07/01 4:13 PM
Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C - case dismissed or converted, fee award not received. (Colvard, Michael)
Related: [-]