Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:23-bk-18321
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Claims Deadline:Dec 21, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Jun 14, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.
25 SE 2nd Ave Ste 550 PMB 1115
Miami, FL 33131-1601
Represented By
Michael A. Frank
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
281 281 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/21 2:38 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Igor Merda Answer Due 3/24/2025 (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
280 280 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/21 2:34 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Fielder Method, LLC Answer Due 3/24/2025 (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
279 279 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/21 2:22 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Billy Young Answer Due 3/24/2025 (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
278 278 cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 5:48 PM
Adversary case 25-01047 Complaint by Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. against Igor Merda. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Lieberman, Brett)
Related: [-]
277 277 cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 5:40 PM
Adversary case 25-01046 Complaint by Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. against Fielder Method, LLC. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Lieberman, Brett)
Related: [-]
276 276 cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 5:30 PM
Adversary case 25-01045 Complaint by Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. against Billy Young. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Lieberman, Brett)
Related: [-]