Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-18321

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:25-ap-01046
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fielder Method, LLC
Represented By
Fielder Method, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.
2875 NE 191st Street Penthouse One
Miami, FL 33180
Represented By
Brett D Lieberman
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Saturday, April 26, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sun 04/27 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Re- Notice of Hearing (Re:10 Motion for Default Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. Hearing RE-scheduled for 06/04/2025 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference.) Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 04/23 11:17 PM
Re- Notice of Scheduling Conference for 06/04/2025 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 04/23 11:09 PM
Re- Notice of Hearing Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. Hearing RE-scheduled for 06/04/2025 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Sanabria, Noemi
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Fri 04/18 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearing (Re:10 Motion for Default Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2025 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference.
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 04/15 9:58 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2025 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/14 5:55 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. (Lewitt, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - F. Mendez Declaration
9 9 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Mon 04/14 5:52 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. Related [+]. (Lewitt, Alexander)
Related: [-] 8 Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Francisco Mendez In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC) filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/14 5:38 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. (Lewitt, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Francisco Mendez In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Fielder Method, LLC
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/03 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Fielder Method, LLC (Re:5 Motion for Default Against Defendant Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.)
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 03/31 3:40 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Fielder Method, LLC Related [+] (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Against Defendant Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 motion Default Fri 03/28 6:32 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Fielder Method, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. (Lewitt, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/05 12:05 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. Related [+]. (Lieberman, Brett)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/21 2:36 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/07/2025 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc.
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/21 2:34 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Fielder Method, LLC Answer Due 3/24/2025 (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 5:40 PM
Adversary case 25-01046 Complaint by Pioneer Inter-Development, Inc. against Fielder Method, LLC. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Lieberman, Brett)
Related: [-]