California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:23-bk-11501
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023

Debtor
Hawkeye Entertainment, LLC
14242 Ventura Blvd Ste 300
Sherman Oaks, CA 91423-2757
Represented By
Sandford L. Frey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

GPO Apr 08 2024
Memorandum of Decision Re: Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case and Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/8/2024 (JC)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
281 281 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 05/07 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 280 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Monday, May 05, 2025
280 280 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 05/05 1:22 PM
Order Continuing Hearings On (1) Debtor's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; And (2) Chapter 11 Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/5/2025 (PG)
Related: [-] doc
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Mon 05/05 1:25 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Hearing to be held on 06/12/2025 at 02:30 PM 21041 Burbank BlvdWoodland Hills, CA 91367 for236 , (PG)
Related: [-] 236 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Hawkeye Entertainment, LLC