Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-11501

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:24-ap-01031
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Smart Capital Investments I,LLC, Smart Capital Investments II, LLC, Smart Capital Investments III, LLC, Smart Capital Investments IV, LLC, and Smart Capital Investments V, LLC
Represented By
Smart Capital Investments I,LLC, Smart Capital Investments II, LLC, Smart Capital Investments III, LLC, Smart Capital Investments IV, LLC, and Smart Capital Investments V, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael S. Chang
Represented By
Michael S. Chang
contact info
Plaintiff
Hawkeye Entertainment, LLC
14242 Ventura Boulevard # 300
Sherman Oaks, CA 91423
Represented By
Sandford L. Frey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, Inc.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Saturday, December 07, 2024
101 101 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/07 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 100 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, December 05, 2024
100 100 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 12/05 12:59 PM
Omnibus Order (1) Staying Discovery -Related Motions And Discovery, (2) Setting Hearing And Briefing Dates Regarding Motion(s) for Partial Summary Judgment On Issue Preclusion And Claim Preclusion, (3) Continuing Case Status Confirmation (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/5/2024 (LF1)
Related: [-] doc