Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:23-bk-10881
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024

Debtor
Trade Finishing and Graphic Services LLC
4120 Commerical Center Drive Suite 250
Austin, TX 78744
Represented By
Christy Lingafelter Heimer
Heimer Law Offices PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801


Docket last updated: 10/21/2023 12:02 AM CDT
Friday, October 20, 2023
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Fri 10/20 12:19 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Trade Finishing and Graphic Services LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 10/27/2023 (Heimer, Christy)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Fri 10/20 12:19 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/30/2023 at 11:00 AM at Via Phone: (888)405-5981; Code: 2733682#. (Heimer, Christy)
Related: [-]