Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles R Merrill
Case #: 4:23-bk-40625
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Jan 13, 2025

Debtor
Sterett Companies, LLC
PO Box 22520
Owensboro, KY 42304-2520
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Asst. U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 12:00 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
681 681 vorder Withdrawing Document Wed 05/21 11:10 AM
This matter having come before the Court on May 21, 2025 for hearing on Emergency Motion to Compel Yager Equipment to Comply with Subpoena672 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion herein be, and hereby is WITHDRAWN as requested by counsel for the movant and the hearing remanded, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Merrill. (AMG)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 17, 2025
680 680 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 05/18 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 678 Order of the Court to continue hearing held on May 15, 2025 on Emergency Motion to Compel Yager Equipment to Comply with Subpoena. Filed by Other Professional Jacen A. Dinoff672 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Merrill. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time)/11:00 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephonic Hearing . Parties to call in at 1-855-244-8681 and use the Access Code 2305 343 1322#. Parties are to use the prompt to bypass the attendee code. Parties are directed to put their call on mute until their case is called. (AMG) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Friday, May 16, 2025
679 679 order Turnover Fri 05/16 8:57 AM
Order Denying Motion for Turnove Related [+] Entered on 5/16/2025. (VS)
Related: [-] 642
Thursday, May 15, 2025
678 678 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 05/15 5:18 PM
Order of the Court to continue hearing held on May 15, 2025 on Emergency Motion to Compel Yager Equipment to Comply with Subpoena. Filed by Other Professional Jacen A. Dinoff672 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Merrill. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:00 AM (Central Time)/11:00 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephonic Hearing . Parties to call in at 1-855-244-8681 and use the Access Code 2305 343 1322#. Parties are to use the prompt to bypass the attendee code. Parties are directed to put their call on mute until their case is called. (AMG)
Related: [-]
677 677 order Appear Telephonically at Hearing Thu 05/15 9:42 AM
Order Granting Motion Allowing Scott Bachert To Appear Telephonically at Hearing set for May 15, 2025676 by dialing 1-855-244-8681 and using Access Code 2305 343 1322 Entered on 5/15/2025. (AMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
676 676 motion Appear Telephonically at Hearing Wed 05/14 3:40 PM
Motion to Appear Telephonically at Hearing On May 15, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Interested Party William Sterett III. (Bachert, Scott)
Related: [-] 665 Modified Order664 Granting Motion Expedite Hearing on663 Emergency Motion to Obtain Authorized Signature on Settlement Agreement. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 09:30 AM Central Time at Owensboro Courthouse, U. S. Courthouse, 423 Frederica Street, Owensboro, KY 42301 . Entered on 5/9/2025. COUNSEL FOR THE MOVANT SHALL PROVIDE NOTICE TO ALL INTERESTED PARTIES AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT UPON COMPLETION OF SERVICE. (AO),674 Order Granting Motion To Set EXPEDITED Hearing regarding Emergency Motion to Compel Yager Equipment to Comply with Subpoena Filed by Other Professional Jacen A. Dinoff673 . EXPEDITED Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 09:30 AM (Central Time) at Owensboro Courthouse, U. S. Courthouse, 423 Frederica Street, Owensboro, KY 42301 . COUNSEL FOR THE MOVANT SHALL PROVIDE NOTICE OF SAID HEARING UPON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES AND SHALL FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT UPON COMPLETION OF SERVICE. cc: electronic sl Entered on 5/14/2025. (AMG)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
675 675 order Extend/Shorten/Waive Time Wed 05/14 2:11 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file objections to applications604 ,605 ,606 . Related [+]. Objections due by 6/23/2025. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. Entered on 5/14/2025. (MES)
Related: [-] 671
674 674 order Set Hearing Wed 05/14 1:36 PM
Order Granting Motion To Set EXPEDITED Hearing regarding Emergency Motion to Compel Yager Equipment to Comply with Subpoena Filed by Other Professional Jacen A. Dinoff673 . EXPEDITED Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 09:30 AM (Central Time) at Owensboro Courthouse, U. S. Courthouse, 423 Frederica Street, Owensboro, KY 42301 . COUNSEL FOR THE MOVANT SHALL PROVIDE NOTICE OF SAID HEARING UPON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES AND SHALL FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT UPON COMPLETION OF SERVICE. cc: electronic sl Entered on 5/14/2025. (AMG)
Related: [-]
673 673 motion Set Hearing Wed 05/14 11:12 AM
Motion to Set Expedited Hearing Related [+] Filed by Other Professional Jacen A. Dinoff. (Brown, Ashley)Modified on 5/14/2025 (CB)
Related: [-] 672 Emergency Motion to Compel Yager Equipment to Comply with Subpoena filed by Other Professional Jacen A. Dinoff
Att: 1 Proposed Order
672 672 motion Compel Wed 05/14 11:09 AM
Emergency Motion to Compel Yager Equipment to Comply with Subpoena. Filed by Other Professional Jacen A. Dinoff. (Brown, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence
Att: 2 Proposed Order