Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lisa Ritchey Craig
Case #: 1:23-bk-61204
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Nov 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.
400 EDGEWOOD AVE SE
Atlanta, GA 30312
Represented By
Tamara Miles Ogier
Ogier Rothschild & Rosenfeld, PC
contact info
Accountant
Bharti Desai PA, P.C.
Accountant
Stonebridge Accounting & Forensics, LLC
Creditor
Lamar Lester
Creditor
Truist Bank f/k/a Branch Banking and Trust Company
Debtor
Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.
Trustee
Leon S. Jones
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee

GPO Nov 07 2024
Memorandum of Decision and Order. It Is Hereby Ordered that Mr. Lester's objections to the Plan are OVERRULED. It Is Further Ordered that the Court will confirm the Plan (Doc. 101, as modified by Doc. 187) under § 1191(b) in a separate order conforming to the Memorandum of Decision and Order. Service by BNC. Entered on 11/7/2024. (related document(s) 101) (mrw) Modified on 11/7/2024 (mrw).

Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
244 244 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution F-non-consensual plan consummated, fees awarded Tue 05/06 10:23 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $28058.28. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 18 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $251101.12, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $6255178.86, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $6255178.86. filed by Trustee. (Jones, Leon)
Related: [-]