Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-61204

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lisa Ritchey Craig
Case #: 1:24-ap-05038
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lamar Lester
Represented By
Lamar Lester
contact info
Plaintiff
Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.
400 Edgewood Ave SE
Atlanta, GA 30312
Represented By
Allen P. Rosenfeld
Ogier Rothschild & Rosenfeld, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
misc Adversary Closed Wed 12/11 11:27 AM
Adversary 1:24-ap-5038 Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/21 12:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Notice Date 11/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
19 19 order Dismiss, Motion to Mon 11/18 2:35 PM
ORDERED that the Complaint will stand DISMISSED without prejudice, unless, within ten (10) days from the date of the entry of this Order, Defendant objects to the dismissal. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 11/18/2024. (cws)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss, Motion to Thu 09/26 2:47 PM
Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Allen P. Rosenfeld on behalf of Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.. (Rosenfeld, Allen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
17 17 misc 0-Withdrawal of Document Thu 06/27 2:08 PM
Withdrawal of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment Filed by Allen P. Rosenfeld on behalf of Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.. Related [+] (Rosenfeld, Allen) Modified on 6/28/2024 (cws)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, May 16, 2024
16 16 answer Reply to Response Thu 05/16 11:11 AM
Reply to Response - Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Allen P. Rosenfeld on behalf of Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.. Related [+](Rosenfeld, Allen)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
15 15 answer Response to Motion Tue 05/14 12:17 PM
Response to Motion Statement Of Material Facts Which Remain In Dispute filed by Herald J.A. Alexander on behalf of Lamar Lester. Related [+](Alexander, Herald)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, May 13, 2024
14 14 answer Response to Motion Mon 05/13 11:56 PM
Response to Debtor's Statement Of Material Facts filed by Herald J.A. Alexander on behalf of Lamar Lester. Related [+](Alexander, Herald) Modified on 5/14/2024 (cws)
Related: [-] 7
13 13 answer Response to Motion Mon 05/13 11:52 PM
Response to Debtor's Motion for summary judgment filed by Herald J.A. Alexander on behalf of Lamar Lester. Related [+](Alexander, Herald) Modified on 5/14/2024 (cws)
Related: [-] 7
Sunday, May 12, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Mon 05/13 12:44 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
11 11 order Extend Time, Motion to Fri 05/10 3:30 PM
Order DENYING Motion to Extend Time to Allow Discovery Necessaryto Respond Fully to the Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] Service by BNC, Order DENYING Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motionfor Summary Judgment Service by BNC. Entered on 5/10/2024. (cdl)
Related: [-] 8 9
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 answer Response to Motion Thu 05/09 2:18 PM
Response to Motion Debtor's response to the following: (1) Creditor Lamar Lesters Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. § 56(d) to Allow Time for Discovery Necessary to Respond Fully to the Motion for Summary Judgment; and (2) Defendants Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment while the Court Considers Defendants Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. §56(d) to Allow Time for Discovery Necessary to Respond Fully to the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Allen P. Rosenfeld on behalf of Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.. Related [+](Rosenfeld, Allen)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
Monday, May 06, 2024
9 9 motion Extend Time, Motion to Mon 05/06 5:19 PM
Motion to Extend the deadline to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment while the considers defendant's motion to allow time for discovery necessary to respond fully to the motion for summary judgment filed by Herald J.A. Alexander on behalf of Lamar Lester. Related [+] (Alexander, Herald) Modified on 5/7/2024 (cws)
Related: [-] 7 ,8
8 8 motion Extend Time, Motion to Mon 05/06 5:00 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Allow Discovery necessary to respond fully to the motion for summary judgment filed by Herald J.A. Alexander on behalf of Lamar Lester. Related [+] (Alexander, Herald) Modified on 5/7/2024 (cws)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 motion Summary Judgment, Motion for Thu 04/18 11:04 AM
Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Plaintiff''s Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute filed by Allen P. Rosenfeld on behalf of Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.. (Rosenfeld, Allen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
6 6 answer Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 03/22 9:46 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Herald J.A. Alexander on behalf of Lamar Lester. Related [+] (Alexander, Herald)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Thursday, March 21, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/21 11:35 PM
Answer to Complaint , Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Herald J.A. Alexander on behalf of Lamar Lester. (Alexander, Herald),1 ,2 . Modified on 3/22/2024 (cws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
4 4 misc 0-Certificate of Service Wed 02/21 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Allen P. Rosenfeld on behalf of Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.. Related [+] (Rosenfeld, Allen)
Related: [-] 2 ,3
3 3 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Wed 02/21 10:58 AM
Summons Issued on Lamar Lester Answer Due 03/22/2024 (cws)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/20 3:32 PM
Amended Complaint - Amended and Restated Complaint filed by Allen P. Rosenfeld on behalf of Edgewood Food Mart, Inc.. Related [+] (Rosenfeld, Allen)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/20 11:28 AM
Adversary case 24-05038 Complaint against Lamar Lester , 12 Related [+] 14 Filed by Edgewood Food Mart, Inc. (Rosenfeld, Allen)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - other