Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:14-bk-12515
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jan 14, 2015
Terminated:Sep 22, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Jun 02, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Dendreon Corporation
1301 2nd Ave
Seattle, WA 98101-3800
Represented By
Anthony W. Clark
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Raquelle L. Kaye
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Felicia Gerber Perlman
Skadden,arps,slate,meagher&floam LLP
contact info
Kenneth S. Ziman
Skadden,arps,slate,meagher&flom LLP
contact info
Sarah E. Pierce
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Michael H. Torkin
Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP
contact info
Maris J. Kandestin
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
David J. Jakus
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Brian D. Glueckstein
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Sean T. Greecher
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Pauline K. Morgan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Mark U Schneiderman
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
David L. Buchbinder
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
David L. Buchbinder
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Bankruptcy Judge Clears Dendreon to Pursue Sale (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 12/18/2014
2. Dendreon Files for Ch. 11 Bankruptcy Protection (abcnews.go.com)
Submitted Mon 11/10/2014
3. Dendreon to Pursue Sale or Reorganization in Bankruptcy (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 11/11/2014
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Thursday, September 22, 2022
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 09/22 10:50 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
972 972 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/21 2:13 PM
Order Closing Close Related [+] Order Signed on 9/21/2022. (CMB)
Related: [-] 969 ,971
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
971 971 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 09/20 11:24 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Closing Case Related [+] Filed by Plan Administrator. (Greecher, Sean)
Related: [-] 969