Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-12515

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:14-bk-12517
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2014
Terminated:Jun 25, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Dendreon Distribution, LLC
1301 2nd Ave
Seattle, WA 98101-3800
Represented By
Sarah E. Pierce
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Thursday, June 25, 2015
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 06/25 12:05 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
10 10 order Final Decree Tue 06/23 4:11 PM
Order, Pursuant to Section 305(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3022, and Local Rule 3022-1, Closing Certain of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. Related [+] Signed on 6/23/2015 (NAB)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, June 18, 2015
9 9 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Thu 06/18 10:20 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Orders Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Dendreon Corporation. (Greecher, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 01/28 8:51 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Corrected Summary of Schedules Page for Dendreon Distribution, LLC (Case No. 14-12517 Filed by Dendreon Distribution, LLC. (Pierce, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 09, 2015
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 01/09 7:16 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Dendreon Distribution, LLC. (Pierce, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 01/09 7:15 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Dendreon Distribution, LLC. (Pierce, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 08, 2015
5 5 court Case Reassigned Thu 01/08 10:30 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Order Signed on 1/7/2015. Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Peter J. Walsh Terminated (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 12, 2014
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 11/12 3:21 PM
Order (A)Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases And (B)Waiving Requirements Granting Motion For Joint Administration. Order Signed on 11/12/2014. (JohnstonJ, Julie) An Order Has Been Entered In This Case Consolidating This Case With The Case of Dendreon Corporation, Case No. 14-12515 PJW), For Procedural Purposes Only And Providing For Its Joint Administration In Accordance With The Terms Thereof. The Docket In Case No. 14-12515 PJW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Mon 11/10 2:58 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Dendreon Corporation. (Pierce, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/10 1:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-12517 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7337780, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/10 1:02 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Dendreon Distribution, LLC. (Pierce, Sarah)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 11/10 8:16 AM
Judge Peter J. Walsh added to case (BA)
Related: [-]