Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-31641

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:23-ap-03091
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.
Represented By
Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel, Trustee
500 N. Akard St., Ste. 3800
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Michael J. Quilling
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
court Close adversary case Wed 02/21 10:22 AM
Adversary case 3:23-ap-3091 closed (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
24 24 2 pgs misc Stipulation Tue 02/20 11:11 AM
Stipulation by Scott M. Seidel, Trustee and FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel, Trustee Related [+]. (Quilling, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 22, 2024
23 23 4 pgs notice Notice (generic) Mon 01/22 2:26 PM
Notice of Agreement filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel, Trustee Related [+]. (Quilling, Michael)
Related: [-] 12 Order to set hearing
Friday, January 19, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of hearing Fri 01/19 3:45 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 2/21/2024 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm for19 , (Langley, Adam)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.
Friday, January 12, 2024
21 21 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 01/12 11:18 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order granting motion for leave to File Briefs in Excess of Page Limits Set in L.B.R. 7002-2(c) (related document14 ) Entered on 1/10/2024. (Blanco, J.)
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
20 20 38 pgs misc Brief Wed 01/10 6:19 PM
Brief in support filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. Related [+]. (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding
19 19 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Wed 01/10 5:48 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1 - Automation Email
Att: 2 26 pgs Exhibit 2 - Collective Bank Statements
18 18 misc Brief Wed 01/10 5:46 PM
Brief in opposition filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. Related [+]. (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for preliminary injunction
Att: 1 178 pgs Exhibit 1 - District Court Lawsuit
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2 - Automation Email
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 3 - November 3 2021 Email
17 17 answer Answer to complaint Wed 01/10 5:23 PM
Answer to complaint filed by Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Leave (Not for Appeal use) Wed 01/10 2:42 PM
Order granting motion for leave to File Briefs in Excess of Page Limits Set in L.B.R. 7002-2(c) Related [+] Entered on 1/10/2024. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
15 15 misc Brief Tue 01/09 4:59 PM
Brief in support filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. Related [+]. (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for leave to file brief in excess of 25 pages
14 14 motion Leave (Not for Appeal use) Tue 01/09 4:57 PM
Motion for leave to file brief in excess of 25 pages filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. Objections due by 1/30/2024. (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
13 13 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 12/21 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Agreed alternative scheduling order (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel, Trustee). Trial date set for 2/28/2024 at 09:30 AM at Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 12/19/2023 (Blanco, J.)
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
12 12 order Set or continue hearing Tue 12/19 9:19 AM
Agreed alternative scheduling order Related [+]. Trial date set for 2/28/2024 at 09:30 AM at Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 12/19/2023 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel, Trustee
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 12/13 2:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel W. Van Horn filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 12/07 3:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert Campbell Hillyer filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Hillyer, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 12/07 3:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Adam M. Langley filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Langley, Adam)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 12/07 3:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Martin A. Sosland filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 12/07 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Candice Marie Carson filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Carson, Candice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Tue 11/21 4:09 PM
Summons service executed on Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. 11/17/2023 (Shepherd, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 40 pgs misc Brief Tue 11/21 4:05 PM
Brief in support filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel, Trustee Related [+]. (Quilling, Michael)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for preliminary injunction
4 4 4 pgs motion Preliminary injunction Tue 11/21 4:03 PM
Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel, Trustee (Quilling, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Thu 11/16 9:50 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 4/2/2024 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 11/16/2023 (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel, Trustee
2 2 court Summons issued Thu 11/16 9:38 AM
Summons issued on Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. Answer Due 12/18/2023 (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/15 1:13 PM
Adversary case 23-03091 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against Fedex Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 91 (Declaratory judgment). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). (Quilling, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Cover Sheet
crditcrd none Wed 11/15 1:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-03091 mvl] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A30900229, amount $ 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1