Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:23-cv-01175
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Case in other court:United States Court of Appeals 5th Circuit, 24-10900
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 4:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Eric Hananoki
Represented By
Andrew Patrick LeGrand
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Abha Khanna
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Theodore J Boutrous, Jr
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Omeed Alerasool
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Elena Alejandra Rodriguez Armenta
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Daniela Lorenzo
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Elisabeth C. Frost
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Amer S Ahmed
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Aria Branch
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Anne Marie Champion
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Christopher D Dodge
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Jay P Srinivasan
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jacob D Shelly
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Media Matters for America
Represented By
Andrew Patrick LeGrand
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Abha Khanna
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Theodore J Boutrous, Jr
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Omeed Alerasool
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Elena Alejandra Rodriguez Armenta
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Daniela Lorenzo
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Elisabeth C. Frost
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Amer S Ahmed
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Aria Branch
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Anne Marie Champion
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Christopher D Dodge
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Jay P Srinivasan
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jacob D Shelly
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Angelo Carusone
Represented By
Andrew Patrick LeGrand
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Amer S Ahmed
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
X Corp.
Represented By
Christopher D Hilton
Stone Hilton PLLC
contact info
John Clay Sullivan
S|l Law PLLC
contact info
Alexander Mark Dvorscak
Stone Hilton PLLC
contact info
Cody C Coll
Stone Hilton PLLC
contact info
Ari Cuenin
Stone Hilton PLLC
contact info
Judd E Stone, II
Stone Hilton PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Movant
Darlene Cerezo Swaffar
Terminated: 11/30/2023
2745 W. Hillsboro Blvd., Suite 1
Deerfield Beach, FL 33442


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
204 204 order Order on Motion for TRO Wed 05/14 4:52 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's156 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Antisuit Injunction. Having considered the Motion, Plaintiff's request is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/14/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
203 203 order Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order Wed 05/14 12:29 PM
ORDER: Before the Court are183 ,185 Motions to Seal. Having considered the Motions, they are GRANTED. (Please see order for specifics.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/14/2025) (jnp) Modified restriction per DJ Chambers on 5/14/2025 (jnp).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
202 202 respm Appendix in Support Tue 05/13 4:47 PM
Appendix in Support filed by X Corp re201 Response/Objection, to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Increase Depositions (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
201 201 respm Response/Objection Tue 05/13 4:45 PM
RESPONSE filed by X Corp re:185 (Document Restricted) Defendants' Verified Motion to Seal Brief and Appendix in Support of Motion for Leave to Increase Depositions and to Amend the Schedule (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
200 200 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Appendix/Brief/Memorandum in Support Tue 05/13 4:42 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re:199 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by X Corp (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
199 199 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection Tue 05/13 4:40 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Response re:185 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by X Corp (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 12, 2025
198 198 respm Appendix in Support Mon 05/12 11:48 PM
Appendix in Support filed by X Corp re197 Response/Objection, (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
197 197 respm Response/Objection Mon 05/12 11:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by X Corp re:183 (Document Restricted) Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Seal Brief and Appendix in Support of Motion to Compel X to Produce Discovery (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
196 196 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Appendix/Brief/Memorandum in Support Mon 05/12 11:39 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re:195 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by X Corp (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
195 195 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection Mon 05/12 11:38 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Response re:183 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by X Corp (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 09, 2025
194 194 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 05/09 8:49 AM
ORDER granting193 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 10/24/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/26/2025. Motions due by 10/27/2025. Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2026. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2026. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/9/2025) (hcc)
Related: [-]