Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Referred: Joel B Toomey
Case #: 3:23-cv-01377
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2023
Terminated:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 19, 2024 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
R.J. Larizza
Defendant
Homer Deloach III
Plaintiff
Terry Lee Freeze
353 Lime Way
Interlachen, FL 32148


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
11 11 appeal USCA order Thu 05/09 3:57 PM
ORDER of USCA Dismissed as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by Terry Lee Freeze. EOD: 5/8/2024 and issued as mandate; USCA number: 24-11212 (SJW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
10 10 appeal Transmittal of initial appeal package Thu 04/18 4:47 PM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re9 Notice of Appeal.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Copy of Appeal,
Att: 3 Copy of Transfer Letter from USCA,
Att: 4 Copy of Mailing Envelope,
Att: 5 Copy of Order
Thursday, March 21, 2024
9 9 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/18 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to8 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Terry Lee Freeze. Filing fee not paid.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transfer letter from USCA,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Monday, March 11, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Mon 03/11 10:13 AM
ORDER adopting 6 the Report and Recommendation, overruling 7 Plaintiff's Objection, denying 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, dismissing the case, and directing the clerk to close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/11/2024. (VNG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
7 7 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 02/29 2:35 PM
OBJECTION to6 Report and Recommendations by Terry Lee Freeze.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
6 6 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 02/13 4:29 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/13/2024. (CSE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/05 3:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Homer Deloach III, R.J. Larizza with Jury Demand filed by Terry Lee Freeze. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Terry Lee Freeze.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/20 3:40 PM
ORDER taking under advisement 2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by January 11, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/20/2023. (CSE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 11/22 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/21 3:07 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Terry Lee Freeze. (BGR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Homer "Gator" DeLoach, III, R.J. Larizza with Jury Demand filed by Terry Lee Freeze. (No service copies received)(BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope