Original Case: 3:23-cv-01377

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-11212
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
R. J. LARIZZA
Defendant - Appellee
SHERIFF OF PUTNAM COUNTY, FLORIDA
Plaintiff - Appellant
TERRY LEE FREEZE
Represented By
Terry Lee Freeze
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 5:05 AM EDT
Thursday, April 18, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Terry Lee Freeze on 03/21/2024. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/07/2024 as to Appellant Terry Lee Freeze
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 2 pgs USDC Order DE 8
Att: 4 8 pgs USDC Report & Recommendation DE 6