Genesis Global Capital, LLC v. Gemini Trust Company, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10063
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10063
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 1:23-ap-01203 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gemini Trust Company, LLC, individually and as agent on behalf of the Earn Users
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Earn Users 1-232,824
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Genesis Global Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/25 10:58 PM
Affidavit of Service of Victor Wong Regarding Notice of Revised Proposed Order Approving Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Motion, Approve Compromise
Fri 04/19 9:36 AM
Order Signed On 4/19/2024, Approving Settlement Agreement Among The Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, The Ad Hoc Group Of Genesis Lenders And The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Transcript
Thu 04/18 11:56 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 04/16/2024 At 11:02 AM RE: Motion To Approve Compromise / Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Approving A Settlement Agreement Among The Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, The Ad Hoc Group Of Genesis Lenders, And The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors.; Etc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/17/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/25/2024. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/9/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/20/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/17/2024. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Mon 04/15 6:57 PM
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Approving Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Affidavit
Mon 04/08 11:11 AM
Affidavit of Compliance Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving a Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Anson B. Frelinghuysen on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Frelinghuysen, Anson) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/02 4:00 PM
Affidavit of Service of Victor Wong Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Approving a Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/20 9:44 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Regarding Gemini Trust Company, LLC's Statement in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving a Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Anson B. Frelinghuysen on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Frelinghuysen, Anson) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/20 8:32 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Gemini Trust Company, LLC's Statement in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving a Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Anson B. Frelinghuysen on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Frelinghuysen, Anson) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
ans
Statement
Tue 03/19 8:01 PM
Statement /Notice of Corrected Exhibit E to Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving a Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Statement
Tue 03/19 2:05 AM
Statement / Gemini Trust Company, LLC's Statement in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving a Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Anson B. Frelinghuysen on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Frelinghuysen, Anson) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Motion, Approve Compromise
Tue 03/19 1:51 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving a Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC with hearing to be held on 4/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Responses due by 4/9/2024,. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 03/07 5:24 PM
FOURTH So Ordered Stipulation And Agreed Order Signed On O3/07/2024 Re: Extending Time To Respond To Complaint . (Mercado, Tracey) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
ans
Affidavit
Thu 02/29 12:42 PM
Affidavit of Service of Lauren G. Walker filed by Donald Burke on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Burke, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Wed 02/28 5:04 PM
Notice of Presentment of Fourth Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Donald Burke on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. with presentment to be held on 3/1/2024 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL) Objections due by 2/29/2024, (Burke, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 02/21 6:51 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/21/2024, Re: Third Stipulation And Agreed Order Extending Time To Respond To Complaint (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/12 11:55 AM
Stipulation / Third Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Donald Burke on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Burke, Donald) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 01/23 1:24 PM
Second Stipulation And Agreed Order Signed On 1/23/2024, Extending Time To Respond To Complaint (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/11 10:35 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Donald Burke on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Burke, Donald) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 01/05 1:59 PM
Affidavit of Service of Eladio Perez Regarding Notice of Adjournment and Rescheduling of the Pretrial Conference on the Complaint Against Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Individually and as Agent on Behalf of the Earn Users, and Earn Users 1-232,824 filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 12/22 6:12 PM
So Ordered Stipulation And Agreed Order Signed On 12/22/2023, Extending Time To Respond To Complaint (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 12/22 10:43 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing and Rescheduling of the Pretrial Conference on the Complaint Against Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Individually and as Agent on Behalf of the Earn Users, and Earn Users 1-232,824 filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. with hearing to be held on 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 12/21 5:40 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Donald Burke on behalf of Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Burke, Donald) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 12/08 5:14 PM
Affidavit of Service of Victor Wong Regarding Adversary Complaint filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/28 6:16 PM
Affidavit of Service of Eladio Perez Regarding Adversary Complaint, Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding, and Adversary Complaint [Case No. 23-10063 Docket No. 968] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 11/22 11:32 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL), Answer due by 12/22/2023, (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 11/21 9:26 PM
Adversary case 23-01203 Complaint against Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Earn Users 1-232,824 (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Exhibit B | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 11/21 9:28 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01203 shl] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16426533. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |