Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:23-bk-42384
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Spartan Group Holdings, LLC
6021 Connection Dr Ste 200
Irving, TX 75039-2607
Represented By
Davor Rukavina
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
Julian Preston Vasek
Munsch Hardt Kopf And Harr
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
405 405 order Compromise Controveresy Mon 04/28 10:42 AM
Order Granting Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement with Sundt Construction, Inc. Related [+]. (kms)
Related: [-] 391 Application for Approval of Compromise and Settlement Agreement with Sundt Construction, Inc. Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC, Spartan Reinforcing, LLC
Thursday, April 24, 2025
404 404 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/24 11:58 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-] 392 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) MOTION TO APPROVE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL THE DEBTORS REMAINING ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS, CLAIMS, AND ENCUMBRANCES. Fee Amount $199 Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 ECF Service List # 3 Mailing Matrix) filed by Debtor Spartan Group Holdings, LLC
Att: 1 Service List
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
court Hearing Set - Without Form Wed 04/23 3:04 PM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 02:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (af)
Related: [-] 392 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) MOTION TO APPROVE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL THE DEBTORS REMAINING ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS, CLAIMS, AND ENCUMBRANCES. Fee Amount $199 Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
403 403 answer Objection Tue 04/22 3:39 PM
Objection Filed by Diverse Capital, LLC, Panthers Capital, LLC, ProVenture Capital, LLC Related [+]. (Wilson, Broocks)
Related: [-] 392 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) MOTION TO APPROVE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL THE DEBTORS REMAINING ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS, CLAIMS, AND ENCUMBRANCES. Fee Amount $199 Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 ECF Service List # 3 Mailing Matrix) filed by Debtor Spartan Group Holdings, LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Diverse PSA
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Diverse UCC-1
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Panthers PSA
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Panthers UCC
Att: 5 Exhibit E - ProVenture PSA
Att: 6 Exhibit F - ProVenture UCC-1
Monday, April 21, 2025
402 402 misc Operating Report Mon 04/21 6:08 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 3/31/2025 Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
401 401 misc Operating Report Mon 04/21 5:56 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 2/28/2025 Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
400 400 misc Operating Report Mon 04/21 5:41 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 1/31/2025 Filed by Spartan Group Holdings, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A