Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-42384

Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:23-bk-42388
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC
6021 Connection Dr Ste 200
Irving, TX 75039-2607
Represented By
Julian Preston Vasek
Munsch Hardt Kopf And Harr
contact info
Davor Rukavina
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
48 48 misc Operating Report Mon 04/21 6:12 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 3/31/2025 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
47 47 misc Operating Report Mon 04/21 6:00 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 2/28/2025 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
46 46 misc Operating Report Mon 04/21 5:46 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 1/31/2025 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
45 45 misc Operating Report Tue 04/08 5:39 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 12/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 30, 2025
44 44 misc Operating Report Thu 01/30 3:52 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period May 2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
43 43 claims Withdrawal of Claim Wed 01/08 1:04 PM
Withdrawal of Claim in the amount of $101,685.66 Claim Number 11 Filed by California Dept of Tax (Riddle, Liz) (dc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
42 42 misc Operating Report Fri 12/27 10:31 AM
Operating Report for Filing Period 11/30/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
41 41 misc Operating Report Fri 12/27 10:30 AM
Operating Report for Filing Period 10/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, October 21, 2024
40 40 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 10/21 11:20 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
39 39 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 10/21 11:10 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
38 38 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 10/21 10:59 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 17, 2024
37 37 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Thu 10/17 4:38 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
36 36 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Thu 10/17 4:28 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
35 35 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Thu 10/17 4:21 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, September 30, 2024
34 34 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 09/30 3:59 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
33 33 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 09/30 3:47 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
32 32 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 09/30 3:33 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, September 19, 2024
31 31 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 09/19 9:44 AM
Withdrawal of Claim in the amount of $1126.02 Claim Number 7 Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Brown, Silvia)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
crditcrd none Fri 08/16 4:38 PM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer of Claim([LINK 23-42388 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13477106, amount $ 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 10, 2024
30 30 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/10 11:29 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Notice of Transfer of Claim in the amount of $14492193.65 Claim Number 9 Fee Amount $28 To Westdale Capital Investors 3, LP 2550 Pacific Avenue Suite 1600 Dallas TX 75226 Filed by Westdale Capital Investors 3, LP filed by Creditor Westdale Capital Investors 3, LP
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
29 29 claims Notice of Transfer of Claim Wed 08/07 12:59 PM
Notice of Transfer of Claim in the amount of $14492193.65 Claim Number 9 Fee Amount $28 To Westdale Capital Investors 3, LP 2550 Pacific Avenue Suite 1600 Dallas TX 75226 Filed by Westdale Capital Investors 3, LP (Winikka, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
28 28 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Tue 07/09 2:29 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
27 27 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Tue 07/09 2:16 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/29/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
26 26 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Tue 07/09 1:56 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, July 08, 2024
25 25 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 07/08 7:26 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
24 24 misc Operating Report (Chapter 11 Non-Small Business Debtor Only) Mon 07/08 4:09 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2023 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, April 19, 2024
23 23 misc Operating Report Fri 04/19 2:29 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 1/31/2024 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, March 29, 2024
22 22 misc Operating Report Fri 03/29 8:37 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 12/31/2023 Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, March 11, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/11 11:34 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Related [+]. (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/19/2024 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 4/11/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/10/2024. (lc) Modified on 12/14/2023 (lc).
Friday, January 19, 2024
20 20 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Fri 01/19 8:30 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Related [+]. (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-] 18 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,., Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs ,List of Equity Security Holders, and Amended List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Document Due 01/19/2024. (Nguyen, Thanhan) Modified on 1/16/2024 (kms). filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC
Monday, January 15, 2024
19 19 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 01/15 9:11 AM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: James W. Brewer) Filed by Vinton Steel LLC (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
18 18 51 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 01/12 11:39 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Summary of Schedules, Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,., Statement of Financial Affairs , List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Document Due 01/19/2024. (Nguyen, Thanhan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 24, 2023
17 17 court Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/24 11:18 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/24/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Granting (RE: related document(s)11 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC). (ym)
Thursday, December 21, 2023
16 16 order Joint Administration Thu 12/21 7:13 PM
Order Granting Related [+]. (ym)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC
court Entry (Joint Administration) Thu 12/21 7:51 PM
THIS CASE IS NOW BEING JOINTLY ADMINISTERED WITH OTHER RELATED ENTITIES UNDER CASE NO. 23-42384 PLEASE CONSULT THE DOCKET SHEET FOR THAT CASE FOR ADDITIONAL MATTERS WHICH MAY AFFECT THIS DEBTOR AND THIS BANKRUPTCY ESTATE. (sd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/20 3:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Related [+]. (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC, 12 Request for Emergency Consideration of Certain First Day Matters Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (RE: related document(s)11 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC, 13 Order Granting Motion for Emergency Hearing. Hearing to be held 12/21/2023 at 01:30 p.m. in the Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom (RE: related document(s)11 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC). (kc)
14 14 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Wed 12/20 2:41 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Related [+]. (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC, Document Due 12/20/2023. filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC, Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Document Due 12/20/2023. filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
13 13 order Emergency Consideration of First Day Matters (Ch. 11 Complex Case) Tue 12/19 2:25 PM
Order Granting Motion for Emergency Hearing. Hearing to be held 12/21/2023 at 01:30 p.m. in the Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom Related [+]. (kc)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC
12 12 motion Complex Chapter 11 Case (Request for Emergency Consideration of First Day Matters) Tue 12/19 1:51 PM
Request for Emergency Consideration of Certain First Day Matters Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Related [+]. (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
court POrder Note Tue 12/19 2:01 PM
Proposed Order or Judgment Submitted At Clerk's Direction RE:12 Request for Emergency Consideration of First Day Matters (Ch. 11 Complex Case)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set - Without Form Tue 12/19 2:26 PM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (kc)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC
Monday, December 18, 2023
11 11 motion Joint Administration Mon 12/18 4:12 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, December 16, 2023
10 10 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/16 11:30 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 12/27/2023. (kms)
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Sat 12/16 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 12/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/19/2024 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 4/11/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/10/2024. (lc) Modified on 12/14/2023 (lc).
Thursday, December 14, 2023
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance Thu 12/14 4:54 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Kenneth Stohner, Jr.) Filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Stohner, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Thu 12/14 3:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/19/2023 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 4/11/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/10/2024. (lc)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Notice of Missing Documents to Individual Debtor Thu 12/14 9:29 AM
Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 12/27/2023. (kms)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Thu 12/14 8:33 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/5/2024 at 11:30 AM at Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 4/11/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/10/2024. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 12/13 9:01 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Notice Wed 12/13 8:36 PM
Certificate of Notice of Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed By Julian Preston Vasek Filed by on behalf of Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 12/13 8:11 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC (Rukavina, Davor)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 12/13 7:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC, Document Due 12/20/2023.(Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 12/13 7:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-42388 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13139272, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
misc Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Wed 12/13 8:22 PM
Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Spartan Fabrication Services, LLC Document Due 12/20/2023. (Vasek, Julian)
Related: [-]