Kansas District Court
Judge:Toby Crouse
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 6:23-cv-01267
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2023
Terminated:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:Sedgwick County District Court, SG2023-cv-300328
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 6:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Textron Aviation, Inc.
Represented By
Stephanie N. Scheck
Stinson, Llp - Wichita
contact info
Luke VanFleteren
Stinson, Llp - Wichita
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Holman
Represented By
Sean M. McGivern
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 10 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 4/10/2025. (msb)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
52 52 appeal Appeal Number Information Fri 05/09 8:20 AM
APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 5/8/2025 and assigned Appeal No. 25-3080 re50 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Larry Holman. (ca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
51 51 appeal Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent Thu 05/08 4:12 PM
PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re50 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment.(ca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Preliminary Packet
50 50 appeal Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Thu 05/08 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to46 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,47 Judgment by Plaintiff Larry Holman. Filing fee $ 605, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6651791. (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]