Original Case: 6:23-cv-01267

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-03080
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:18 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
TEXTRON AVIATION, INC.
Represented By
Stephanie Nicole Scheck
Stinson
contact info
Luke VanFleteren
Stinson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LARRY HOLMAN
Represented By
Sean M. McGivern
Graybill & Hazlewood
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2025 2:18 AM MDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
[11180310] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/08/2025. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 05/22/2025 for Larry Holman. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 05/22/2025 for Textron Aviation, Inc. 25-3080
Related: [-]
Att: 1 22 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil