Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:C Ashley Royal
Case #: 5:23-cv-00508
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 6:42 AM EDT
Defendant
SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By
GORDON GRANT GREENWOOD
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANNON DAWN PERCHES
991 NORTH AVE
MACON, GA 31211

GPO Jan 02 2024
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER to Recast Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 01/02/2024. (elp)
GPO Jan 31 2024
ORDER Directing Service. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 01/31/2024. (elp)
GPO Oct 10 2024
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 10/10/2024 (elp)
GPO Oct 11 2024
JUDGMENT (elp)
GPO Nov 06 2024
ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 11/6/2024 (elp)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
appeal Electronic Availability of ROA Tue 01/28 8:34 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:26 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (elp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
28 28 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 12/05 2:04 PM
USCA Case Number 24-13929 H re26 Notice of Appeal filed by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES. (elp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
27 27 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 11/26 12:34 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:26 Notice of Appeal,18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint,24 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,19 Judgment Judge Appealed: C. Ashley Royal. Court Reporter: N/A. Fee: Not Paid. (elp)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Clerk's Decision Re: E-Filing Tue 11/26 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF CLERK'S DECISION RE: E-Filing for SHANNON DAWN PERCHES. Request to E-File is GRANTED. You must register to E-File via PACER.gov.(elp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
26 26 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 11/26 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint,24 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,19 Judgment by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES. (elp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Thu 11/07 9:01 AM
ORDER denying20 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 11/6/2024 (elp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/05 9:29 AM
REPLY to Response filed by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint,19 Judgment (elp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/28 11:02 AM
RESPONSE filed by SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint,19 Judgment (GREENWOOD, GORDON)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
21 21 misc Exhibit Tue 10/22 9:20 AM
EXHIBIT(S) by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint,19 Judgment(elp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Text Message
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
20 20 motion Reconsideration Fri 10/18 2:36 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint,19 Judgment Filed by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES.(elp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Photos of Windows
Friday, October 11, 2024
19 19 order Judgment Fri 10/11 2:01 PM
JUDGMENT (elp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
18 18 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint Thu 10/10 4:31 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 10/10/2024 (elp)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/10 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KELLI P HILL on behalf of SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY Attorney KELLI P HILL added to party SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY(pty:dft)(HILL, KELLI)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 10/04 9:08 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting15 Motion to Stay. All discovery and other deadlines in the Scheduling Order are hereby STAYED pending the Court's resolution of10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 10/4/2024. (dcb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
15 15 motion Stay Thu 10/03 3:40 PM
MOTION to Stay Deadline to Court's Rules 16 and 26 Order re14 Order - Rules 16/26 by SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY filed by GORDON GRANT GREENWOOD.(GREENWOOD, GORDON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay Rules 16 and 26
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Mon 09/30 2:10 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/31/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 09/30/2024.(bsl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Required Form
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/08 11:10 AM
REPLY to Response filed by SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY re10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,5 Recast Complaint/Petition : (GREENWOOD, GORDON)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/29 1:39 PM
RESPONSE filed by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES re10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,5 Recast Complaint/Petition.(elp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/29 9:12 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (GREENWOOD, GORDON)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Complaint Fri 03/29 9:11 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,5 Recast Complaint/Petition : by SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY filed by GORDON GRANT GREENWOOD.(GREENWOOD, GORDON)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/12 2:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY as to SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (GREENWOOD, GORDON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
8 8 service USM 285 Process Receipt and Return Thu 02/08 3:59 PM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (elp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
7 7 service USM 285 Process Receipt and Return Thu 02/01 4:46 PM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (elp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Directing Service Wed 01/31 3:09 PM
ORDER Directing Service. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 01/31/2024. (elp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
5 5 cmp Recast Complaint/Petition Fri 01/19 1:59 PM
RECAST1 Complaint against All Defendants by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES(sst)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
4 4 8 pgs order Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/02 3:31 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER to Recast Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 01/02/2024. (elp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
3 3 misc Exhibit Wed 12/20 9:02 AM
EXHIBIT(S) - Exhibit C - Gmail Email Correspondence by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES re1 Complaint(ans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit D - Expert Vintage Window Repair Quote,
Att: 2 Exhibit E - Rebuttal to Respondent's Position Statement
Friday, December 15, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/18 3:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES.(elp)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Complaint Mon 12/18 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT against SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY filed by SHANNON DAWN PERCHES(elp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- EEOC letter