Original Case: 5:23-cv-00508

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-13929
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 04, 2024 3:17 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
SHERIDAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By
Gordon Grant Greenwood
James-Bates-Brannan-Groover, LLP
contact info
Kelli P. Hill
James-Bates-Brannan-Groover, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHANNON DAWN PERCHES
Represented By
Shannon Dawn Perches
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/04/2024 3:17 AM EST
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Shannon Dawn Perches on 11/25/2024. Fee Status: IFP Granted. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/23/2024 as to Appellant Shannon Dawn Perches. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/31/2024 as to Appellee Sheridan Construction Company.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 1 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 12 pgs USDC Order DE #18
Att: 4 3 pgs USDC Order DE #24
Att: 5 1 pgs USDC Judgment DE #19