Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:23-cv-04208
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Trisha Breedlove
Defendant
Nick Kerr
Defendant
Greg Shumaker
Defendant
Brian Spitz
Defendant
Spitz Law Firm, LLC
Plaintiff
April Clark
3037 Clairpoint Way
Columbus, OH 43227

GPO Jan 25 2024
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/25/2024. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
GPO Apr 02 2024
OPINION AND ORDER denying 14 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/2/2024. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
GPO Jul 09 2024
ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's objection; ADOPTING IN FULL Report and Recommendations DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's claims in the seven cases in which she filed objections. Plaintiff's Title VII race discrimination claim in Kidz Planet can proceed, the rest of her claims in that case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's pending motions for leave to file an amended complaint and also her motions for reconsideration. DENYING Plaintiff's motion for e-filing rights. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/9/2024. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
30 30 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 02/26 2:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA - MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (kh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
29 29 appeal USCA Order Thu 09/26 7:39 AM
ORDER of USCA as to27 Notice of Appeal filed by April Clark: The appeal has been dismissed for want of prosecution. Note: No Mandate to issue . (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
28 28 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 08/09 9:41 AM
USCA Case Number 24-3691 for27 Notice of Appeal filed by April Clark. (pb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
27 27 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 07/31 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re25 Order on Report and Recommendations &26 Clerk's Judgment (FILING FEE DUE) by Plaintiff April Clark. (er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter from Sixth Circuit
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
26 26 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 07/09 12:28 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Order signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/9/2024. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
25 25 11 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Objection to Magistrate Judge Order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Order to Tue 07/09 12:16 PM
ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's objection; ADOPTING IN FULL Report and Recommendations DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's claims in the seven cases in which she filed objections. Plaintiff's Title VII race discrimination claim in Kidz Planet can proceed, the rest of her claims in that case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's pending motions for leave to file an amended complaint and also her motions for reconsideration. DENYING Plaintiff's motion for e-filing rights. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/9/2024. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Objection to Magistrate Judge Order Mon 07/01 1:39 PM
ORDER overruling(19)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order and Ms. Clark's motion to recuse Magistrate Judge Jolson is DENIED in case 2:23-cv-04201-ALM-KAJ; overruling(18)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:23-cv-04202-ALM-KAJ; overruling(16)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:23-cv-04203-ALM-KAJ; overruling(16)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:23-cv-04204-ALM-KAJ; overruling(14)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:23-cv-04205-ALM-KAJ; overruling(20)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:23-cv-04206-ALM-KAJ; overruling(16)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:23-cv-04208-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/1/2024. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
23 23 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 06/17 12:12 PM
USCA Case Number 24-3531 Gretchen S. Abruzzo, Case Manager (513-564-7018). (kh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
21 21 misc Docket Annotation Thu 06/06 8:21 AM
USCA CASE NUMBER, 24-3478 Regarding Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition; case manager Gretchen S. Abruzzo, 513-564-7018. (er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
22 22 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 06/10 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re (17 in 2:23-cv-04205-ALM-KAJ) Order, (19 in 2:23-cv-04208-ALM-KAJ) Order, (23 in 2:23-cv-04206-ALM-KAJ) Order, (FILING FEE DUE) by Plaintiff April Clark. (er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter from Sixth Circuit
Monday, May 20, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Mon 05/20 2:58 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE pending Plaintiff's fulfillment of the requirements noted in the Court's Order deeming Plaintiff a vexatious litigator. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to notify this Court within thirty (30) days of this Order if she retains counsel or obtains the required statement from a qualifying attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/20/2024. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-04205-ALM-KAJ, 2:23-cv-04206-ALM-KAJ, 2:23-cv-04208-ALM-KAJ (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
19 19 6 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 4:36 PM
ORDER this Court DEEMS MS. CLARK A VEXATIOUS LITIGATOR. She is therefore ENJOINED from filing further motions in the above-captioned cases and from initiating new actions in a manner inconsistent with the guidelines stated in this Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/15/2024. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
18 18 misc Affidavit Mon 05/13 11:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Disqualification In Re Judge Algenon Marbley by Plaintiff April Clark. (mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
17 17 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Wed 05/08 2:50 PM
ORDER consolidating cases, 2:23-cv-4205, 2:23-cv-2406 and 2:23-cv-4208 and ORDERING the parties to file all documents in the earliest filed case, No. 2:23-cv-04205. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/8/2024. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-04205-ALM-KAJ, 2:23-cv-04206-ALM-KAJ, 2:23-cv-04208-ALM-KAJ (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
16 16 motion Objection to Magistrate Judge Order Mon 04/08 5:07 PM
Objection to 4/2/24 Magistrate Judge Order15 Order on Motion for Recusal by Plaintiff April Clark. (sem)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Recusal Tue 04/02 1:52 PM
OPINION AND ORDER denying14 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/2/2024. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
14 14 motion Recusal Wed 03/27 2:42 PM
MOTION for Magistrate Judge Jolson to Recuse by Plaintiff April Clark. (er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
13 13 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 03/14 4:58 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff April Clark. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Env.
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
12 12 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 03/13 8:36 AM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff April Clark. (er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/28 2:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Shumaker, Spitz Law Firm, LLC, filed by April Clark. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
10 10 3 pgs motion Order to Tue 02/27 10:46 AM
MOTION for Order to file electronically by Plaintiff April Clark. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Fri 02/23 4:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff April Clark. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Env.
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
8 8 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 02/22 3:43 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff April Clark. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/14 9:42 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection as to4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/14/24. (jr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/13 4:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections as to4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by April Clark. New date requested 2/13/2024. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Env.
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/25 4:37 PM
This entry is for statistical purposes only. See ECF No.3 for the document. (er)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 01/25 4:34 PM
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/25/2024. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
3 3 order Related Case Memorandum Tue 01/09 5:14 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:23-cv-4201 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/21 11:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff April Clark. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Envelope