Original Case: 2:23-cv-04208

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03691
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 25, 2024 6:04 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
SPITZ LAW FIRM, LLC
Defendant - Appellee
BRIAN D. SPITZ
Defendant - Appellee
GREG T. SHUMAKER
Defendant - Appellee
TRISHA M. BREEDLOVE
Defendant - Appellee
NICK KERR
Plaintiff - Appellant
APRIL CLARK
Represented By
April Clark
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 6:04 AM CDT
Thursday, August 08, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Gretchen Abruzzo (GSA)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. April Clark. Transcript needed: n. (GSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
Att: 2 7 pgs form(s) sent
LETTER SENT to Ms. April Clark, directing that the enclosed notice of appeal be signed and returned to this court by 09/09/2024. (GSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Unsigned NOA Letter
Att: 2 6 pgs unsigned noa