Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20225

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:23-ap-02114
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Trustee
405 S. Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
United States Trustee
contact info
Plaintiff
John Curtis, Plan Administrator
Rocky Mountain Advisory, LLC 15 West South Temple, Suite 500
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Matthew M. Boley
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
Plaintiff
Mountain Crane Service, LLC
393 S Monterey St
Salt Lake City, UT 84104
Represented By
Matthew M. Boley
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
Jeffrey L. Trousdale
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
14 14 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (order) Tue 07/02 10:19 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+] (am)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 misc Pending Order Tue 07/02 9:03 AM
Pending Order Re:12 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Tue 07/02 9:01 AM
Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Mountain Crane Service, LLC. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Tue 07/02 10:21 AM
Adversary Case 23-02114 Disposed. (am)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 notice Notice Mon 07/01 2:08 PM
Notice Related [+] Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings
10 10 notice Notice Mon 07/01 1:57 PM
(WITHDRAWN) Notice Related [+] Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda) Modified on 7/1/2024 (am)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings
notice Withdrawal of Incorrectly Filed Document (no image) Mon 07/01 2:07 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Incorrectly Filed Document Related [+] Wrong document filed Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-] 10 Notice
Thursday, January 18, 2024
9 9 order Stay Proceedings (order) Thu 01/18 12:04 PM
Order Granting the United States Trustee's Motion to Stay Further Proceedings Given the Supreme Court's Grant of a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari in Office of the United States Trustee v. John Q. Hammons Fall 2006, LLC, No. 22-1238 Related [+] (am)
Related: [-] 3
8 8 misc Pending Order Thu 01/18 11:25 AM
Pending Order Re:3 Motion To Stay Proceedings. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 order Expedite Hearing (order) Thu 01/11 3:18 PM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+]; Hearing Date:January 29, 2024 at 2:30 p.m (js)
Related: [-] 4
6 6 notice *Notice of Hearing Thu 01/11 1:52 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by United States Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/29/2024 at 02:30 PM at ZoomGov.com/join - JTM: Meeting ID: 161 5478 8875, Passcode: 3834658, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 1/26/2024. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-] 3 Motion To Stay Proceedings
5 5 misc Pending Order Thu 01/11 1:50 PM
Pending Order Re:4 Motion to Expedite Hearing. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Shorten Time to Expedite Hearing (Motion) Thu 01/11 1:50 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-] 3 Motion To Stay Proceedings
3 3 motion Stay Proceedings (Motion) Thu 01/11 1:48 PM
Motion To Stay Proceedings Given the Supreme Court's Grant of a Petition for Writ of Certiorari in Office of the United States Trustee v. John Q. Hammons Fall 2006, LLC, No. 22-1238 Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/08 2:20 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: United States Trustee. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 01/02 9:44 AM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by John Curtis, Mountain Crane Service, LLC. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 12/22 10:35 AM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by United States Trustee. (Willden tr, Melinda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 10:35 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 23-02114 . Complaint by John Curtis, Mountain Crane Service, LLC against United States Trustee. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [14 Related [+], 11]. (Trousdale, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - othercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property