Cruz v. UIA, et al
Original Case: 3:17-cv-02261
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-civil-02011 |
Type | civil / private / other statutes |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 29, 2023 4:07 AM EST |
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN FEDERATION OF LABOR AND CONGRESS OF INDUSTRIAL ORGANIZATIONS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNION INDEPENDIENTE DE EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ACUEDUCTOS Y ALCANTARILLADOS, (UIA)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PUERTO RICO AQUEDUCT & SEWER AUTHORITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PEDRO R. PIERLUISI-URRUTIA, in his official capacity as Governor of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
OFFICE AND PROFESSIONAL EMPLOYEES OF THE PUBLIC BUILDINGS AUTHORITY UNION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
STATE INSURANCE FUND EMPLOYEES UNION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
REYNALDO CRUZ
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/29/2023 4:07 AM EST |
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #236) filed by Appellant Reynaldo Cruz. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 01/11/2024. 23-2011 (KPC) | ||
Att: 1 77 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF | ||
1 pgs NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Puerto Rico Aqueduct & Sewer Authority filed by Attorney Alberto Tabales-Maldonado. Served on 12/28/2023. 23-2011 (AT) | ||
1 pgs NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Reynaldo Cruz filed by Attorney Matthew B. Gilliam. Served on 12/28/2023. 23-2011 (MG) |