Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11800

New Mexico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David T Thuma
Case #: 1:24-ap-01001
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
State of New Mexico Deparment of Taxation and Revenue, Defendant
PO Box 8575
Albuquerque, NM 87198
Represented By
State of New Mexico Deparment of Taxation and Revenue
contact info
Plaintiff
Yvette J. Gonzales, Plaintiff
PO Box 1037
Placitas, NM 87043
Represented By
Chris W Pierce
Walker & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/06 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, November 04, 2024
15 15 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) Mon 11/04 2:37 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (crl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/04 2:39 PM
Adversary Case 24-01001 t Closed. (crl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
14 14 order Rescheduling Hearing (Order) Thu 06/06 10:51 AM
Stipulated Order Modifying Order Resulting from Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 09:00 AM at Judge Thuma's Jemez Courtroom. (crl)
Related: [-] 6 Order Resulting from Scheduling Conference
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
13 13 motion Extend/ShortenTime (Motion) Tue 06/04 2:22 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Submit Consolidated Pretrial Order. Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales (Pierce, Chris)
Related: [-] 6 Order Resulting from Scheduling Conference
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 misc Affidavit/Declaration Mon 05/13 3:46 PM
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales Related [+]. (Pierce, Chris)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment
11 11 motion Summary Judgment (Motion) Mon 05/13 3:44 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment or for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales (Pierce, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
10 10 answer Response Tue 03/19 2:05 PM
Response Related [+]. Filed by Defendant New Mexico Taxation and Revenue Department (Swenson, Angela)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint
Thursday, March 14, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/14 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Trustee's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant served 3/14/2024; to those indicated on certificate Filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales. (Pierce, Chris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
8 8 order Stipulated Order Thu 02/29 10:40 AM
Stipulated Order Granting Leave for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint (crl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/28 12:58 PM
1st Amended Complaint by Chris W Pierce on behalf of Yvette J. Gonzales against New Mexico Taxation and Revenue Department. Related [+]. (Pierce, Chris)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales
Friday, February 23, 2024
6 6 order Resulting from Scheduling Conference (Order) Fri 02/23 1:51 PM
Order Resulting from Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 09:00 AM at Judge Thuma's Jemez Courtroom. (crl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales
court Report from Initial Scheduling Conference Fri 02/23 9:44 AM
TEXT ONLY REPORT FROM INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. Scheduling Conference conducted by Courtroom Deputy, Christa R. Lucero on 2/23/2024. Appearances: Chris W Pierce of Walker & Associates, P.C., Angela Swenson of New Mexico Attorney General Office . Parties requested a 60 day discovery deadline; Court to prepare scheduling order. (crl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Involuntary Petition Fri 02/09 5:53 PM
Amended Answer to Involuntary Petition Filed by Defendant New Mexico Taxation and Revenue Department Related [+]. (Swenson, Angela)
Related: [-] 3 Certificate of Service
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
4 4 answer Answer to Involuntary Petition Fri 02/09 5:45 PM
Answer to Involuntary Petition Filed by Defendant New Mexico Taxation and Revenue Department Related [+]. (Swenson, Angela)
Related: [-] 3 Certificate of Service
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 01/23 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by NG. Receipt Number 10000076. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/05 3:31 PM
Certificate of Service served 1/5/2024; to those indicated on certificate Filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales Related [+]. (Pierce, Chris)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 01/05 11:13 AM
Summons Issued for service by Plaintiff upon Defendant New Mexico Taxation and Revenue Department Date Issued 1/5/2024, Answer Due 2/5/2024 Related [+]. Scheduling conference to be held on 2/21/2024 at 09:30 AM in Judge Thuma's Jemez Courtroom. (crl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales
court Entry (Public - NEF will go to all parties) Fri 01/05 11:08 AM
Filing Fee Amount $350.00 deferred at case opening; clerks notice of fees due has been entered in related bankruptcy case no. 15-11800 t7. (crl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/02 2:13 PM
Adversary case 24-01001 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (81 (Subordination of claim or interest)): Complaint by Yvette J. Gonzales against State of New Mexico Deparment of Taxation and Revenue. Receipt Number: DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred. (Pierce, Chris)
Related: [-]