Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Case #: 1:24-cv-00027
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, A2305520
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 9:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Sam's Club
Represented By
Michael Joseph Caligaris
Reminger Co. Lpa - Cleveland
contact info
Nathan Andrew Lennon
Reminger
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Plaintiff
Arvenia Allen
Represented By
Richard P Gabelman
Richard P. Gabelman
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Doe Corporations 11-20
Terminated: 06/03/2024


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
27 27 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 05/09 8:54 AM
USCA Case Number 25-3363 for26 Notice of Appeal filed by Arvenia Allen; case number Ryan Orme, 513-564-7079. (er)
Related: [-]
26 26 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 05/08 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re22 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,23 Clerk's Judgment (Filing fee $ 605 has been paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10500397) by Plaintiff Arvenia Allen. (Scheier, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Gates Rai for Plaintiff Arvenia Allen (Rai, Laura)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Scheier for Plaintiff Arvenia Allen (Scheier, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
23 23 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 04/10 2:40 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming22 Order and Opinion. (kaf)
Related: [-]
22 22 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 04/10 2:38 PM
ORDER AND OPINION: The Court GRANTS Defendant Sam's Club's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.14 ). This case shall be TERMINATED from the Court's docket. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/10/2025. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/02 11:14 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Sam's Club Disclosure of Lay Witnesses (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/08 9:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Sam's Club. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/02 2:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Arvenia Allen. (Moore, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 respm Supplemental - Opposing Tue 10/01 4:50 PM
Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Searchable PDF filed by Plaintiff Arvenia Allen. (Moore, Joel)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice) Tue 10/01 4:18 PM
Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Arvenia Allen., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Arvenia Allen. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 10/2/2024. (bjc)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/01 12:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Arvenia Allen. (Moore, Joel)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/01 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Samuel Moore for Plaintiff Arvenia Allen (Moore, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
14 14 motion Summary Judgment Thu 09/12 2:53 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Sam's Club. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/29 4:01 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Sam's Club re12 Notice (Other) Declaration of Counsel (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/29 3:46 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Sam's Club Notice of Filing (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
11 11 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Tue 06/18 1:30 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 7/15/2024. Settlement Demand due by 8/2/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/1/2024. Motions to amend pleadings/add parties due by 9/1/2024. Motions related to pleadings due by 9/1/2024. Plaintiff's Experts due by 9/2/2024. Defendants' Experts due by 12/1/2024. Rebuttal Experts due by 1/2/2025. Non-Expert (Fact) Witnesses due by 1/2/2025. Discovery due by 2/1/2025. Dispositive motions due by 3/15/2025. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 06/18/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 06/18 1:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew W. McFarland: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 06/18/2024. Present by phone were Attorney Richard Gabelman on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorney Michael Caligaris on behalf of Defendants. The Court discussed this matter with counsel and will file a calendar order by separate docket entry. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
10 10 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 06/17 3:22 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Defendant Sam's Club. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
9 9 order Order Wed 06/12 4:02 PM
NOTATION ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report (Doc.8 ). Under Section I(A)(2) of the Court's Standing Orders, the parties are required to submit a Joint Discovery Plan using the form provided on the Southern District of Ohio's website. As the parties' 26(f) Report (Doc.8 ) does not comply with this requirement, the Report (Doc.8 ) is STRICKEN. The parties are DIRECTED to submit a new 26(f) Report that complies with the Court's Standing Orders by 06/17/2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 06/12/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/12 4:04 PM
Deadline set per 06/12/2024 Notation Order: Amended Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 06/17/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 06/11 2:19 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Defendant Sam's Club. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 06/03 2:19 PM
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS JOHN DOES 1-10 AND JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 11-20. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 06/03/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/07 9:32 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED that the Court proposes to dismiss the claims against John Does 1-10 and John Doe Corporations 11-20 without prejudice. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, within fourteen (14) days why the claims against John Does 1-10 and John Doe Corporations 11-20 should not be dismissed for failure of service. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/07/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/22 3:23 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed on 1/22/2024 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2305520) by Sam's Club. (zmc)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 01/22 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Corporations 11-20, John Does 1-10, and Sam's Club originally filed on 12/21/2023 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2305520) by Arvenia Allen. (zmc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Mon 01/22 1:53 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sam's Club. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/22 1:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sam's Club. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/22 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A2305520 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9776448), filed by Sam's Club. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Stipulation re Damages,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Answer,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
misc Docket Annotation Mon 01/22 3:17 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (zmc)
Related: [-]