Original Case: 1:24-cv-00027

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-03363
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
SAM'S CLUB
Represented By
Michael Caligaris
Reminger Company
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN DOES, 1-10
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS, 11-20
Plaintiff - Appellant
ARVENIA ALLEN
Represented By
Michael Lewis Scheier
Keating, Muething & Klekamp
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 3:58 AM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (RO)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Arvenia Allen. Transcript needed: n. (RO)
Related: [-]
6 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/17/2025; appellee brief due 07/17/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]