New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:24-bk-10561
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Jan 08, 2025
Plan Confirmed:May 31, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Careismatic Brands, LLC
1119 Colorado Ave
Santa Monica, CA 90401-3009
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 31 seconds ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
915 915 misc Support Thu 01/30 2:11 PM
Signature in support of Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company. (dmc)
Related: [-] 914 Correspondence re: Notice of Name Change From:Dolin, Recano & Company, Inc to: Donlin, Recano & Compan, LLC filed by Donlin Recano & Company. (dmc) filed by Noticing Agent Donlin Recano & Company
Monday, January 27, 2025
914 914 misc Correspondence Tue 01/28 3:17 PM
Correspondence re: Notice of Name Change From:Dolin, Recano & Company, Inc to: Donlin, Recano & Compan, LLC filed by Donlin Recano & Company. (dmc)
Related: [-]