Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-10561

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:24-bk-10580
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2024
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Silverts Adaptive, LLC
1119 Colorado Ave
Santa Monica, CA 90401-3009
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Monday, July 29, 2024
10 10 order Final Decree Mon 07/29 1:28 PM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (jf)
Related: [-]
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 07/29 1:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. The claims agent follow up deadline is 8/28/2024. (jf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
utility Remark Mon 07/22 3:51 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of Careismatic Group Inc., Case No. 24-10569 The docket in Case No. 24-10569 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+]. (jf)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Friday, July 19, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 07/20 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
8 8 6 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 07/17 3:39 PM
Order (I) Granting Post-Effective Date Debtors Motion for Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/17/2024. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Silverts Adaptive, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 05/21/2024. filed by Debtor Silverts Adaptive, LLC
Friday, January 26, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 01/27 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 01/26 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
5 5 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Joint Administration - multi case Wed 01/24 2:20 PM
Order on Motion For Joint Administration. Lead Case: 24-10561 Member Cases: 24-10560 24-10562 24-10563 24-10564 24-10565 24-10566 24-10567 24-10568 24-10569 24-10570 24-10571 24-10572 24-10573 24-10574 24-10575 24-10576 24-10577 24-10578 24-10579 24-10580 24-10581 Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice.. (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
4 4 order Show Cause Tue 01/23 11:20 AM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of All Creditors, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/23/2024. Hearing scheduled for 2/20/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 01/23 9:34 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10580 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46291259, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Tue 01/23 2:24 PM
Hearing Withdrawn, Motion to Extend Time to File Missing Schedules filed., Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 4 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of All Creditors, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/23/2024. Hearing scheduled for 2/20/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.
Monday, January 22, 2024
3 3 motion Motion for Joint Administration - Multi-Case Mon 01/22 11:43 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-10560 24-10562 24-10562 24-10563 24-10564 24-10565, 24-10566 24-10567 24-10568 24-10569 24-10570 24-10571 24-10572 24-10573 24-10574 24-10575 24-10576 24-10577 24-10578 24-10579 24-10580 24-10581 (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned Mon 01/22 10:12 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Vincent F. Papalia added to the case. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 01/22 10:11 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Silverts Adaptive, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 05/21/2024. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]