Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Greg Kays
Case #: 4:24-cv-00098
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:May 22, 2024
Case in other court:16th Circuit of Jackson County - Independence Div., 2316-CV33612
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 5:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Olin Corporation
Represented By
Anna K. Perocchi
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, Llp - Boston
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephanie L Sweitzer
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Hannah Fisher
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Olin Winchester, LLC
Represented By
Anna K. Perocchi
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, Llp - Boston
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephanie L Sweitzer
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Hannah Fisher
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Winchester Ammunition, Inc.
Represented By
Anna K. Perocchi
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, Llp - Boston
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stephanie L Sweitzer
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Hannah Fisher
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juanita Jones
Represented By
Kyle Edward Murphy
Murphy & Kinney, LLC
contact info
R. Edward Murphy
Murphy & Murphy, P.C.
contact info

GPO May 22 2024
ORDER granting 16 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed on 5/22/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
36 36 appeal USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule Mon 06/24 11:25 AM
USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit Court of Appeals is 24-2267 for34 Notice of Appeal filed by Juanita Jones. Briefing schedule entered by the Court of Appeals is attached.(Terry, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule
Thursday, June 20, 2024
35 35 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals Thu 06/20 12:45 PM
TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document34 Notice of Appeal. (Cole, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
34 34 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 06/20 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Juanita Jones. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AMOWDC-9066528. (Murphy, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
33 33 order Clerk's Judgment Thu 05/23 2:52 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Strodtman, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
32 32 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/22 9:22 AM
ORDER granting16 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed on 5/22/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
31 31 discov Certificate of Service Tue 05/14 2:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants Defendants First Discovery Requests and Notice of Plaintiffs Deposition filed by Stephanie L Sweitzer on behalf of Defendants Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, Winchester Ammunition, Inc..(Sweitzer, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
30 30 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Mon 04/29 11:32 AM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephanie L Sweitzer on behalf of Defendants Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, Winchester Ammunition, Inc.. Related [+] (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 04/24 2:34 PM
ORDER denying27 Plaintiff's motion to amend. Signed on 4/24/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Mon 04/22 3:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Juanita Jones filed by Kyle Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Juanita Jones.(Murphy, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/19 5:10 PM
MOTION to amend/correct filed by Kyle Edward Murphy on behalf of Juanita Jones. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/3/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Murphy, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1A - Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1C - MCHR Notice of Right to Sue
Monday, April 15, 2024
26 26 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/15 9:52 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kyle Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Juanita Jones. Reply suggestions due by 4/29/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Murphy, Kyle)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
25 25 order Order Wed 04/10 4:07 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendants moved to dismiss this case on March 22, 2024, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Plaintiff has not responded and the deadline to do so has passed. Accordingly, by April 15, 2024, Plaintiff is ORDERED to either (1) file a response to Defendants' motion to dismiss, or (2) explain why the Court should not decide the motion on the existing record. Plaintiff's failure to file anything by the April 15, 2024, deadline will result in the Court deciding the motion based on the existing record. Signed on 4/10/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
24 24 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Tue 04/09 5:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kyle Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Juanita Jones.(Murphy, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of MAPADMIN Fri 04/05 3:08 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP reassignment to Program Director.(Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/02 4:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2025 at 10:00 AM via telephone conference before District Judge Greg Kays. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2025 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 4/2/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Tue 04/02 2:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Stephanie L Sweitzer on behalf of Defendants Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, Winchester Ammunition, Inc..(Sweitzer, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 04/02 1:54 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, Winchester Ammunition, Inc.. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/25 8:11 AM
ORDER granting15 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Anna K. Perocchi for Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, and Winchester Ammunition, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/22 3:26 PM
NOTICE of appearance by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Juanita Jones (Attorney R. Edward Murphy added to party Juanita Jones(pty:pla))(Murphy, R.)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Fri 03/22 3:22 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephanie L Sweitzer on behalf of Defendants Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, Winchester Ammunition, Inc.. Related [+] (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/22 3:03 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephanie L Sweitzer on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/22 2:43 PM
Motion to allow Anna K. Perocchi to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8924980) filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of All Defendants. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
14 14 12 pgs order Order Tue 03/05 1:22 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER. All attorneys and unrepresented parties shall carefully study and comply with the ISO along with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Western District of Missouri's Local Rules (the Local Rules). Failure to comply with the ISO may result in the Court imposing sanctions, including but not limited to monetary payments, dismissal of claims or cases, entry of default judgment, or other appropriate sanctions. Signed on 3/5/24 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/05 11:31 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part11 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and Stay Other Deadlines. Defendants' request for extension of time to file a responsive pleading is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before March 22, 2024. Defendants' request to stay all case deadlines pending resolution of their anticipated motion to dismiss is DENIED. See L.R. 26.1(b) (stating "the filing of any motion-including a motion to dismiss, a discovery motion, or a motion for summary judgment-does not stay the action or excuse the parties from complying with any discovery rule or scheduling order"). Signed on 3/5/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
12 12 order Letter of reassignment Mon 03/04 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to District Judge Greg Kays. Judge Gaddy no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 24-0098 CV-W-DGK. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/14 5:06 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply and Stay Other Deadlines (Partially Unopposed) filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/28/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
10 10 order Rule 16 Notice Mon 02/12 10:34 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE - ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR RULE 26 CONFERENCE, JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER, AND PARTIES' DISCLOSURES. The parties' disclosure statements are due by 2/26/2024. The Rule 26 conference shall be held on or before 3/19/2024. The joint proposed scheduling order must be filed by no later than 4/2/2024. Signed on 2/12/2024 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Transferring/Reassigning Case Mon 02/12 10:13 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER OF CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy for all further proceedings. District Judge Gary A. Fenner no longer assigned to case. Please take note that the new case number is 24-00098 CV-W-WBG. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Grube, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/12 10:07 AM
ORDER granting6 and7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Stephanie L. Sweitzer and Hannah Fisher for Olin Winchester, LLC, Olin Corporation and for Winchester Ammunition, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Mon 02/12 10:18 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 3/4/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Grube, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/09 5:01 PM
Motion to allow Hannah Fisher to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8857818) filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of All Defendants. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/09 4:55 PM
Motion to allow Stephanie L. Sweitzer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8857802) filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of All Defendants. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of MAPN Fri 02/09 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/09 4:42 PM
NOTICE of filing "Notice of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court" by Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, Winchester Ammunition, Inc.(Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
3 3 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Fri 02/09 3:23 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of Defendants Olin Corporation, Olin Winchester, LLC, Winchester Ammunition, Inc..(Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 3:15 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of All Defendants (Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/09 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2316-CV33612, filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8856974.(Herrington, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet