Original Case: 4:24-cv-00098

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02267
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Olin Winchester, LLC
Represented By
Hannah Fisher
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Anna K. Perocchi
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Stephanie L. Sweitzer
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Olin Corporation
Represented By
Hannah Fisher
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Anna K. Perocchi
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Stephanie L. Sweitzer
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Winchester Ammunition, Inc.
Represented By
Hannah Fisher
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Anna K. Perocchi
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Stephanie L. Sweitzer
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
MORGAN & LEWIS
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Juanita Jones
Represented By
Robert Edward Murphy
LAW OFFICE OF R. EDWARD MURPHY
contact info
Kyle Edward Murphy
MURPHY & KINNEY
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2024 3:58 AM CDT
Friday, June 21, 2024
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5405612] 24-2267 (CAH)
Related: [-]
23 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 5/22/24, judgment 5/23/24. [5405617] 24-2267 (CAH)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 07/31/2024. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Juanita Jones due 07/31/2024.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5405618] 24-2267 (CAH)
Related: [-]