New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:24-bk-11362
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Aug 02, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Invitae Corporation
1400 16th Street
San Francisco, CA 94103
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 4:27 PM EST
Attorney
White & Case LLP
Represented By
John S. Mairo
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Attorney
Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP
Attorney
Cole Schotz P.C.
Court Plaza North 25 Main Street
Hackensack, NJ 07602
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Attorney
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
Represented By
Christopher P. Mazza
Porzio Bromberg & Newman
contact info
John S. Mairo
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
GBF, Inc.
Represented By
Brett S. Theisen
Gibbons PC
contact info
Creditor
Edward King
1600 Pacific Hwy. Room 162
San Diego, CA 92101
Creditor
Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd.
11 Broadway, Suite 715
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Paul Rubin
Rubin LLC
contact info
Creditor
Life Technologies Corp
Represented By
Andrew R. Turner
Turner Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
MassMutual Asset Finance LLC
Represented By
Thomas O. Bean
Verrill Dana LLP
contact info
Holly Smith Miller
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Nathaniel R. Hull
Verrill Dana, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Natera Inc.
Represented By
Kyle McEvilly
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Deanna D. Boll
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Darren Azman
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Robert Malone
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Warren J. Martin, Jr.
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman
contact info
Brett Bakemeyer
White & Case LLP
contact info
Harrison Denman
White & Case LLP
contact info
Christopher P. Mazza
Porzio Bromberg & Newman
contact info
Andrew Zatz
White & Case LLP
contact info
Samuel P. Hershey
White & Case LLP
contact info
Ashley Chase
White & Case LLP
contact info
J. Christopher Shore
White & Case LLP
contact info
John S. Mairo
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Amish R. Doshi
Doshi Legal Group, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Salesforce, Inc.
Represented By
James C Vandermark
White And Williams, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Snowflake Inc.
Represented By
Alan F. Kaufman
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Creditor
Page Sorensen
100 Pine Street Suite 1250
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Michael A Filoromo, III
Katz Banks Kumin LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tecan Genomics, Inc.
Represented By
Meredith Mitnick
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association as Trustee and Collateral Agent for the 4.5% Series A and Series B Convertible Senior Secured Notes due 2028
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07960
Represented By
Joseph L. Schwartz
Riker, Danig, Scherer, Hyland, Perretti
contact info
Creditor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Eamonn O'Hagan
U.S. Attorneys Office
contact info
Creditor
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By
Joseph Charles Barsalona, II
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Workday, Inc.
Represented By
Tina Moss
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fisher Scientific Company, LLC
1500 One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Andrew R. Turner
Turner Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
EPAM Systems, Inc.
41 University Drive Suite 202
Newtown, PA 23219
Represented By
Kristin Wigness
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Connor W. Symons
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Alton Tech ADA LLC
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Amacon Westpark Investment Corporation
Represented By
Kenneth L. Baum
Law Offices Of Kenneth L. Baum LLC
contact info
Creditor
Braidwell LP
Represented By
Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Robert Klyman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Riley M Sissung
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Creditor
BrainDo LLC
FisherBroyles LLP 27100 Oakmead Dr #306
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Patricia B. Fugee
Fisherbroyles
contact info
Creditor
CSC Leasing Co.
Represented By
James K. Donaldson
Woods Rogers Vandeventer Black PLC
contact info
Terri Jane Freedman
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Creditor
California Physicians Service d/b/a Blue Shield of California
Represented By
Jack Shrum
Jack Shrum, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Chubb Companies
Represented By
Catherine B. Heitzenrater
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Creditor
Datasite LLC
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Deerfield Partners, L.P.
Represented By
James L Bromley
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
James N. Lawlor
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Represented By
Allison M. Wuertz
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Labcorp Genetics. Inc.
Represented By
Allison M. Wuertz
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Gleit
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Brett D. Goodman
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Nicholas Marten
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.
Represented By
Erin R. Fay
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Alison Genova
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Vaco LLC
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP c/o Elisha J. Kobre 1445 Ross Avenue Suite 3600
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Elisha Kobre
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Interested Party
1600 16th Street LLC
Represented By
Aaron Applebaum
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
ASB De Haro Place, LLC
Represented By
Aaron Applebaum
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
Meghana Seethamraju
Represented By
David M. Banker
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Integrated DNA Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Quaid Karcher
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Michael Mervis
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Jorge Gonzalez
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Baker Bros. Advisors LP
Represented By
Stephanie Lindemuth
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ravi Theja Kambhampati
Represented By
David M. Banker
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Deloitte Tax LLP
Other Prof.
Ducera Partners, LLC
Represented By
John S. Mairo
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
Province, LLC
Other Prof.
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway, 3rd Floor
El Segundo, CA 90245
Other Prof.
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Other Prof.
FTI Consulting, Inc.
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Sponder
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info
Lauren Bielskie
Doj-Ust
contact info

GPO May 16 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION (related document:158 Application For Retention of Professional Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective as of February 13, 2024 filed by Debtor Invitae Corporation, 475 Order on Application For Retention).. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/16/2024. (dmi)

Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
1192 1192 misc Document Thu 05/08 3:55 PM
Document re: Notice of Adjournment of Plan Administrator's Fifth Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim Pursuant to Sections 502(b) and 503(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007, and Local Rules 3007-1 and 3007-2 Related [+] filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Invitae Corporation. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-] 1171 Objection filed by Debtor Invitae Corporation,1172 Support filed by Debtor Invitae Corporation
court Hearing Held and Continued Thu 05/08 11:35 AM
Minute of 5/8/2025; Hearing Held OUTCOME: GRANTED IN PART and Continued. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/22/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton . (wiq)
Related: [-] 1171 Objection to - Plan Administrator's Fifth Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim Pursuant to Sections 502(b) and 503(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007, and Local Rules 3007-1 and 3007-2 (related document:1057 ORDER GRANTING PLAN ADMINISTRATORS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (A) APPROVING THE (I) OMNIBUS CLAIMS OBJECTION PROCEDURES AND FORM OF NOTICE, (II) OMNIBUS SUBSTANTIVE CLAIMS OBJECTIONS, AND (III) SATISFACTION PROCEDURES AND FORM OF NOTICE AND (B) WAIVING BANKRUPTCY RULE 3007(e). (Related Doc999 ). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/26/2024. (wiq)) filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Invitae Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Spirito Declaration) Filed by Debtor Invitae Corporation
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 05/08 11:36 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/8/2025; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2025 at 10:00 AM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq)
Related: [-] 1153 Motion to Compel Payment of Administrative Expenses Filed by Holly Smith Miller on behalf of Humana Insurance Company, Humana Health Plan, Inc., and Health Value Management, Inc. d/b/a ChoiceCare. Hearing scheduled for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law #2 Exhibit A #3 Proposed Order #4 Certificate of Service) Filed by Creditor Humana Insurance Company, Humana Health Plan, Inc., and Health Value Management, Inc. d/b/a ChoiceCare
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1191 1191 claims Certificate of Mailing - Limited User Tue 05/06 11:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 1188
Saturday, May 03, 2025
1190 1190 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 05/04 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1189 1189 claims Certificate of Mailing - Limited User Fri 05/02 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 1183 ,1182 ,1184 ,1180 ,1185 ,1181
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1188 1188 order Application (Generic) Thu 05/01 11:18 AM
JOINT STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER RESOLVING FCA CLAIMS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND IFPA CLAIMS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/1/2025. (wiq)
Related: [-] 1179