Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-11362

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:24-bk-11365
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Genetic Solutions LLC
1400 16th St
San Francisco, CA 94103-5110
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Thursday, February 22, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 02/23 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
4 4 order Joint Administration Tue 02/20 8:35 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 24-11362 Member Cases: 24-11365 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/16/2024. (wiq)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
utility Remark Wed 02/14 7:18 AM
Remark: Case related to 24-11361 24-11362 24-11363 24-11364 and 24-11366 (mrg)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Wed 02/14 9:17 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11365 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46385078, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
3 3 motion Joint Administration Tue 02/13 10:55 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-11361 24-11362 24-11363 24-11364 24-11365 24-11366 Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Genetic Solutions LLC. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned Tue 02/13 10:10 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Michael B. Kaplan added to the case. (nrf)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 02/13 10:08 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Genetic Solutions LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/12/2024. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]