Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:24-bk-10143
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P., Debtor
18300 S Ih 35
Buda, TX 78610-5735
Represented By
Todd Brice Headden
Hayward PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
161 161 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 05/14 7:39 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
160 160 answer Objection Wed 05/14 4:08 PM
Supplemental Objection Filed by Sarah P. Santos for Creditor Frost Bank (Santos, Sarah) Related [+]
Related: [-] 151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
159 159 answer Response Tue 05/13 11:41 PM
Response Filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P. (Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 152 Objection to Joint Plan of Reorganization and Renewed Motion to Convert or Dismiss Filed by Sarah P. Santos for Creditor Frost Bank (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Santos, Sarah) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))Modified on 5/12/2025 to edit docket text.
158 158 misc Notice of Filing Proposed Order (AU, EP, MD) Tue 05/13 5:07 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Confirmation Order filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..(Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts),151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 12, 2025
157 157 misc ~Document Mon 05/12 10:20 PM
Declaration of K. Chapman in Support of Confirmation filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))
156 156 misc ~Document Mon 05/12 7:38 PM
Corrected Ballot Summary filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..(Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 155 Ballot Summary filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Declaration of T. Headden # 2 Ex. B- Ballots)(Headden, Todd) (Related Document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts),151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts)))
Att: 1 Ex. A- Corrected Declaration
Att: 2 Ex. B- Corrected Ballots
155 155 misc ~Document Mon 05/12 5:56 PM
Ballot Summary filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..(Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts),151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))
Att: 1 Ex. A- Declaration of T. Headden
Att: 2 Ex. B- Ballots
154 154 misc Exhibit Index and Witness List Mon 05/12 4:52 PM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on May 16, 2025 filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts),151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))
Friday, May 09, 2025
153 153 misc Exhibit Index and Witness List Fri 05/09 3:49 PM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on 05/16/2025 filed by Sarah P. Santos for Creditor Frost Bank. (Santos, Sarah) Related [+]
Related: [-] 142 BNC Certificate of Mailing (Related Document(s):141 Order Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Hearing on Confirmation and Related Deadlines. Ballot Due Date: 5/9/2025, Objection to Confirmation of Plan Due Date: 5/9/2025, Confirmation Of Plan Hearing Date and Time: 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM (related document(s):127 Disclosure Statement filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..,128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts)) (Order entered on 3/28/2025)) Notice Date 03/30/2025. (Admin.)
152 152 answer Objection Fri 05/09 3:39 PM
Objection Filed by Sarah P. Santos for Creditor Frost Bank (Santos, Sarah) Related [+]
Related: [-] 128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
151 151 23 pgs plan Chapter 11 Plan Fri 05/09 2:32 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..(Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts)
Att: 1 Plan with Redlines