Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:24-bk-10143
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P., Debtor
18300 S Ih 35
Buda, TX 78610-5735
Represented By
Todd Brice Headden
Hayward PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
163 163 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 05/21 6:05 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
162 162 court Exhibit Index and Witness List (court) Tue 05/20 11:35 AM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on 05/16/2025 Related [+] DEBTOR'S EXHIBITS 1-15, FROST'S EXHIBITS 1-64 ADMITTED (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. )
Friday, May 16, 2025
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Mon 05/19 7:11 AM
Hearing CONTINUED FROM 5/16/25 TO 5/23/25 FOR ORAL RULING Related [+] ORAL RULING Set For 5/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 COURT HAS SET AN ORAL RULING VIA ZOOM; ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR BY ZOOM OR PHONE; NOT NECESSARY TO FILE A REQUEST TO APPEAR BY ZOOM (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. )
court Hearing Held Tue 05/20 11:51 AM
Hearing Held: ORAL RULING SET 5/23/25 AT 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM/DEBTOR'S EXHIBITS 1-15, FROST'S BANK EXHIBITS 1-64 ADMITTED. Related [+] (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
161 161 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 05/14 7:39 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P..(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
160 160 answer Objection Wed 05/14 4:08 PM
Supplemental Objection Filed by Sarah P. Santos for Creditor Frost Bank (Santos, Sarah) Related [+]
Related: [-] 151 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Plan with Redlines)(Headden, Todd) (related document(s):128 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Kyle Chapman Motor Sales, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidation Analysis # 2 Ex. B- Plan Projections # 3 Ex. C- Executory Contracts))