Consolidated
Lead case: 1:24-md-03090

Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:24-cv-20677
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:Feb 22, 2024
Case in other court:Connecticut, 3:23-cv-00740
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Aetna Inc.
Represented By
Wystan M. Ackerman
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Jenna Scoville
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llphtfd
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Vogel
Represented By
Brian D. Flick
Dann Law Firm
contact info
John Kanca, IV
The Kanca Law Firm LLC
contact info
Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, March 29, 2024
29 29 order Pretrial Order Fri 03/29 2:17 PM
PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
28 28 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 02/22 8:16 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II on 2/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (gp)
Related: [-]
27 27 transfer MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt Thu 02/22 2:35 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Connecticut. Case Number 23-cv-00740-KAD with documents 1-24. Assigned FLSD Case Number 24-cv-20677-RAR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 24-md-3090-RAR (jas)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 02/22 2:33 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. (jas)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/22 8:19 PM
Civil Case Closed for administrative purposes only. Per Order of Consolidation and Administrative Close-Out. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
25 25 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE Wed 02/21 5:10 PM
Case transferred in from Connecticut; Case Number 3:23-cv-00740. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
24 24 MDL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Clerk J. Adams, MDL Panel on 2/14/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
23 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER. For purposes of consolidation, this case is reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/24/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER OF TRANSFER: The Honorable Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer hereby transfers the above-identified case to the docket of THE HONORABLE Robert N. Chatigny for all purposes. All future pleadings and filings in this case shall bear docket number3:23CV740 (RNC). Pleadings or documents related to this action shall be filed with the Clerks Office in Hartford, Connecticut, where the docket is maintained. [See Local Rule 3(a).] Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/24/2023.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
Cases associated. Create association to 3:23-cv-00635-RNC. (Samson, Jessalyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
21 21 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by Donna Vogel. (Flick, Brian)
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Flick on behalf of Donna Vogel (Flick, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
19 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of Donna Vogel (Zimmerman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
18 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7410029) by Donna Vogel. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/11/2023. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/13/2023. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
16 16 AFFIDAVIT re8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian D. Flick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7400339) Signed By Brian D. Flick filed by Donna Vogel. (Kanca, John)
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2023 (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
15 15 ORDER granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/10/2023. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2023. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
14 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7410029) by Donna Vogel.(Kanca, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Monday, July 10, 2023
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Scoville on behalf of Aetna, Inc (Scoville, Jenna)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Aetna, Inc (Ackerman, Wystan)
Related: [-]
11 11 Disclosure Statement by Aetna, Inc identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna, Inc. (Tucci, Theodore)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of Aetna, Inc (Tucci, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
9 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Donna Vogel waiver sent on 6/30/2023, answer due 8/29/2023 filed by Donna Vogel. (Kanca, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian D. Flick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7400339) by Donna Vogel.(Kanca, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746(2)
Friday, June 09, 2023
7 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aetna, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Kanca, IV* *The Kanca Law Firm LLC* *40 Richards Avenue, Suite 353* *Norwalk, CT 06854*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by Donna Vogel,5 Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
5 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/7/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/7/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2023 Discovery due by 12/7/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2024 Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2023.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs COMPLAINT against Aetna, Inc ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7373598.), filed by Donna Vogel.(Kanca, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aetna, Inc. (Kanca, John)
Related: [-]
Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]