Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:24-md-03090
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1407 Multidistrict Litigation
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Consol Defendant
Aetna Corporate Services LLC
Consol Defendant
Aetna Health Inc.
Consol Defendant
Aetna Health Management, Inc.
Consol Defendant
Aetna International LLC
Consol Defendant
Aetna Life Insurance Company
Consol Defendant
Aetna Resources LLC
Consol Defendant
Aetna, Inc.
Consol Defendant
Aleksandra Peters
Consol Defendant
Amy Chen
Consol Defendant
Ann Lamont
Consol Defendant
Anthem Insurance Companies Inc.
Consol Defendant
Ben Robbins
Consol Defendant
Brightline, Inc.
Consol Defendant
CHSPSC, LLC
Consol Defendant
Community Health Systems, Inc.
Consol Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Consol Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Consol Defendant
David Grodberg
Consol Defendant
Elevance Health, Inc.
Consol Defendant
Emily Melton
Consol Defendant
Fortra, LLC
Consol Defendant
Gary Alpert
Consol Defendant
Giovanni Colella
Consol Defendant
GV 2021, L.P.
Consol Defendant
Haleigh Tebben
Consol Defendant
Imagine360, LLC
Consol Defendant
Intellihartx, LLC
Consol Defendant
Johnny Kim
Consol Defendant
Kevin Miller
Consol Defendant
Moses Taylor Hospital
Consol Defendant
Myra Altman
Consol Defendant
Naomi Allen
Consol Defendant
NationsBenefits Holdings LLC
Consol Defendant
NationsBenefits Holdings, LLC
Consol Defendant
NationsBenefits, LLC
Consol Defendant
Oak HC/FT Partners III, L.P.
Consol Defendant
Regional Hospital of Scranton
Consol Defendant
Roderick Veazey
Consol Defendant
Romy Saloner
Consol Defendant
Santa Clara Family Health Plan
Consol Defendant
Sarah Weatherhead
Consol Defendant
Scranton Hospital Company, LLC
Consol Defendant
Threshold Ventu Brightline, Inc.
Consol Defendant
Threshold Ventures III, L.P.
Consol Defendant
Wilkes-Barre General Hospital
Consol Defendant
Wilkes-Barre Hospital Company, LLC
Consol Plaintiff
A. T.
Consol Plaintiff
Alauntae Butts
Consol Plaintiff
Angela Brodrick
Consol Plaintiff
Angela Martin
Consol Plaintiff
Angela Schuh
Consol Plaintiff
Anthony Collins
Consol Plaintiff
Anthony Ndifor
Consol Plaintiff
Anthony Skuya
Consol Plaintiff
Ariana Skurauskis
Consol Plaintiff
Arnishe Shepherd
Consol Plaintiff
Artie Fullington
Consol Plaintiff
Barbara Kosbab
Consol Plaintiff
Bethany Gatti
Consol Plaintiff
Beverly Banks
Consol Plaintiff
Brandy McGowan
Consol Plaintiff
Branton Underwood
Consol Plaintiff
Brenda Gilpatrick
Consol Plaintiff
Brett Yonally
Consol Plaintiff
Catherine Radke
Consol Plaintiff
Cindy Rougeau
Consol Plaintiff
Cynthia Whites
Consol Plaintiff
David Mueller
Consol Plaintiff
Denise Emery
Consol Plaintiff
Dennis Ross
Consol Plaintiff
Donisha Jackson
Consol Plaintiff
Donna Vogel
Consol Plaintiff
Edward Hubler
Consol Plaintiff
Edward Wilczynski
Consol Plaintiff
Edwin Rodriguez
Consol Plaintiff
Eileen Clancy
Consol Plaintiff
Glenda G. Corn
Consol Plaintiff
Gordon Titcomb
Consol Plaintiff
Iraida Gonzalez
Consol Plaintiff
James Craig
Consol Plaintiff
Jeanne Peffley-Wilson
Consol Plaintiff
Jefferey King
Consol Plaintiff
Jennifer Marino
Consol Plaintiff
Jessica Guerrero
Consol Plaintiff
John Davis
Consol Plaintiff
John Vogel
Consol Plaintiff
Jose Cabrales
Consol Plaintiff
K. U.
Consol Plaintiff
Kelly Kern
Consol Plaintiff
Kevin McCoy
Consol Plaintiff
Kevin Stone
Consol Plaintiff
Kimberly Dekenipp
Consol Plaintiff
Kimberly Hoffman
Consol Plaintiff
Kristi Mcdavitt
Consol Plaintiff
Kyle Castro
Consol Plaintiff
Lauren Perrone
Consol Plaintiff
Lawrence Kosbab
Consol Plaintiff
Leonore Caliendo
Consol Plaintiff
Leroy Fuss
Consol Plaintiff
Linda Caudill
Consol Plaintiff
Lola Tatum
Consol Plaintiff
Marc Aubie
Consol Plaintiff
Mariana Sanchez Lopez
Consol Plaintiff
Mark Brewer
Consol Plaintiff
Marquese York
Consol Plaintiff
Martin Radke
Consol Plaintiff
Matthew Casella
Consol Plaintiff
Melissa Morales
Consol Plaintiff
Michael Sezawich
Consol Plaintiff
Michael Wanser
Consol Plaintiff
Michelle Ronne
Consol Plaintiff
Muhammed Zahid
Consol Plaintiff
Nancy Paterson
Consol Plaintiff
Nicholas Timmons
Consol Plaintiff
Nicholas Venezia
Consol Plaintiff
Nigel Keep
Consol Plaintiff
Noah Rogers
Consol Plaintiff
O. B.
Consol Plaintiff
O. E. B.
Consol Plaintiff
Pamela Lazaroff
Consol Plaintiff
Randall Lynn Carter
Consol Plaintiff
Renee Rogers
Consol Plaintiff
Richard Walck
Consol Plaintiff
Richard Xaver
Consol Plaintiff
Robert Joseph Terwilliger
Consol Plaintiff
Robert Lizotte
Consol Plaintiff
Robert Taylor
Consol Plaintiff
Roberta Platt
Consol Plaintiff
Roger Jackson
Consol Plaintiff
Ryan Watson
Consol Plaintiff
S. W.
Consol Plaintiff
Sadie Brooks
Consol Plaintiff
Sandra Kuffrey
Consol Plaintiff
Sharon McCoy
Consol Plaintiff
Shontay Marshall
Consol Plaintiff
Stephen Lazaroff
Consol Plaintiff
Stephen Wolsey
Consol Plaintiff
T. E.
Consol Plaintiff
Tara Hartzel Vancosky
Consol Plaintiff
Teresa Hassan
Consol Plaintiff
Terrance Rosa
Consol Plaintiff
Thomas Kelly
Consol Plaintiff
Timothy Ferguson
Consol Plaintiff
Tracy Bussell
Consol Plaintiff
Valarie Venezia
Consol Plaintiff
Valerie Anderson
Consol Plaintiff
Victoria Evans
Consol Plaintiff
Vincentina Luciano
Consol Plaintiff
Wanda Wilson
Consol Plaintiff
Wilhelmina Gill
Consol Plaintiff
William S. Henry
Consol Plaintiff
Zariah Brown
Defendant
All Defendants
In Re
FORTRA FILE TRANSFER SOFTWARE DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Interested Party
Executive Committee
Mediator
Michael Ungar
Plaintiff
All Plaintiffs
Plaintiff
Brightline Plaintiffs
Plaintiff
Track 1 Plaintiffs
Plaintiff
Track 2 Plaintiffs
Plaintiff
Track 3 Plaintiffs
Plaintiff
Track 4 Plaintiffs
ThirdParty Defendant
Fortra, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
NationsBenefits Holdings, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
NationsBenefits, LLC

GPO Sep 18 2024
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (agh)
GPO Feb 11 2025
ORDER granting 198 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Opt-Out List) (jgz)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
231 231 30+ pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 04/15 4:09 PM
ORDER granting230 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Global Settlement Agreement. Final Approval Hearing set for Monday, September 15, 2025 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II on 4/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
230 230 motion Settlement Thu 04/10 6:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Global Settlement by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/24/2025.(Ostrow, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Joint Declaration of Lead Counsel in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Global Settlement Agreement
229 229 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Thu 04/10 3:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney James J. Pizzirusso re223 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
228 228 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Wed 04/09 6:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting227 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Page Limit. Plaintiff is permitted to exceed the page limit by 11 pages. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/9/2025. (koy)
Related: [-]
227 227 motion File Excess Pages Wed 04/09 5:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs.(Ostrow, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order