Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Case #: 4:24-cv-40030
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Colonel John E Mawn, Jr
Interim Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police, in his official capacity 470 Worcester Road
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Siobhan E. Kelly
Massachusetts State Policy
contact info
Defendant
Motorola Solutions, Inc.
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Alycia M. Kennedy
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Howard M. Cooper
Todd & Weld
contact info
Defendant
Callyo 2009 Corp.
Represented By
Alycia M. Kennedy
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Howard M. Cooper
Todd & Weld
contact info
Defendant
SHI International Corp.
Represented By
David C. Kurtz
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Persky
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Courtemanche
46 Natick Street
Fitchburg, MA 01420
Represented By
Christopher R. Batinsey
Batinsey Legal PC
contact info
James L. O'Connor, Jr.
Nickless, Phillips And O'Connor
contact info
Christopher J. Walton
Attorney Christopher Walton
contact info
Plaintiff
Brett Foresman
146 Sherman Street
Gardner, MA 01440
Represented By
Christopher R. Batinsey
Batinsey Legal PC
contact info
James L. O'Connor, Jr.
Nickless, Phillips And O'Connor
contact info
Christopher J. Walton
Attorney Christopher Walton
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Rios
170 High Street 1R
Fitchburg, MA 01420
Represented By
Christopher R. Batinsey
Batinsey Legal PC
contact info
James L. O'Connor, Jr.
Nickless, Phillips And O'Connor
contact info
Christopher J. Walton
Attorney Christopher Walton
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Williams
344 South Street
Fitchburg, MA 01420
Represented By
Christopher R. Batinsey
Batinsey Legal PC
contact info
James L. O'Connor, Jr.
Nickless, Phillips And O'Connor
contact info
Christopher J. Walton
Attorney Christopher Walton
contact info

GPO Dec 13 2024
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 44 Motion for Discovery. (Frisch, Suzanne)
GPO Feb 27 2025
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 31 SHI'S Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, SHI's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. As SHI is no longer a party, it relieved of any obligation to attend the motion hearing on 2/28/25. (SF)
GPO Mar 28 2025
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: Defendants Motorola and Callyo's Motion to Dismiss 29 is GRANTED as to Counts I, III, and V and DENIED as to Counts II, IV and VII; Noble/MSPs Motion to Dismiss 53 is DENIED as to Count IX and DENIED AS MOOT as to Count VIII. SO ORDERED. (SF)
GPO May 12 2025
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. Memorandum and Order DENYING ECF Nos. 90 & 83. (SF)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
99 99 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 05/13 3:18 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by John E Mawn, Jr.(Collins, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
98 98 appeal Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA Mon 05/12 5:23 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re75 Notice of Appeal, Documents included: ECF Nos. 96 and 97 (MAP)
Related: [-]
97 97 9 pgs order Memorandum & Order Mon 05/12 4:26 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. Memorandum and Order DENYING ECF Nos. 90 & 83. (SF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
96 96 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/09 4:59 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying83 Motion For Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.60(b)(6); denying90 Motion to Stay to Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 8(a)(1)(A). Written order to issue. (SF)
Related: [-]
95 95 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/09 10:42 AM
Emergency MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Emergency Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal by John E Mawn, Jr.(Collins, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
94 94 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 4:20 PM
Opposition re83 MOTION For Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.60(b)(6) filed by Jason Courtemanche, Brett Foresman, Juan Rios, Dennis Williams. (Batinsey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
93 93 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 4:17 PM
Opposition re90 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 8(a)(1)(A) filed by Jason Courtemanche, Brett Foresman, Juan Rios, Dennis Williams. (Batinsey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
92 92 11 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Thu 05/08 4:14 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jason Courtemanche, Brett Foresman, Juan Rios, Dennis Williams to85 MOTION for Reconsideration . (Batinsey, Christopher)
Related: [-]