Original Case: 4:24-cv-40030

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-civil-01386
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By
Howard M. Cooper
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Lori B. Leskin
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Michael Kim Krouse
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Alycia M. Kennedy
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Defendant
CALLYO 2009 CORP.
Represented By
Howard M. Cooper
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Lori B. Leskin
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Michael Kim Krouse
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Alycia M. Kennedy
Todd & Weld LLP
contact info
Defendant
SHI INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By
Jonathan D. Persky
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP
contact info
David C. Kurtz
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
GEOFFREY D. NOBLE, in their official capacity as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police
Represented By
Robert Papandrea
Morgan Brown & Joy LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Thomas Collins
Morgan Brown & Joy LLP
contact info
Siobhan E. Kelly
MA Dept of State Police
contact info
Keith Andrew Paquette
MA Dept of State Police
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JASON COURTEMANCHE
Represented By
Christopher J. Walton
contact info
Christopher R. Batinsey
contact info
James L. O'Connor Jr.
Seder & Chandler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRETT FORESMAN
Represented By
Christopher J. Walton
contact info
Christopher R. Batinsey
contact info
James L. O'Connor Jr.
Seder & Chandler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JUAN RIOS
Represented By
Christopher J. Walton
contact info
Christopher R. Batinsey
contact info
James L. O'Connor Jr.
Seder & Chandler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DENNIS WILLIAMS
Represented By
Christopher J. Walton
contact info
Christopher R. Batinsey
contact info
James L. O'Connor Jr.
Seder & Chandler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 5:00 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
Public docket note: Pursuant to Fed. R. App. 43(c)(2), John E. Mawn, Jr. has been substituted by Geoffrey D. Noble as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police. 25-1386 (ATC)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #75) filed by Appellant Geoffrey D. Noble. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 05/07/2025. 25-1386 (ATC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 62 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF
Att: 3 7 pgs Case Opening Notice