Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-60088

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 6:24-ap-06009
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Love Out Loud, LLC
P.O. Box 2631
Georgetown, TX 78627
Represented By
John Macpete
contact info
David C. Alford
Pakis, Giotes, Page & Burleson
contact info
Defendant
Debra L. Trujillo
Represented By
David C. Alford
Pakis, Giotes, Page & Burleson
contact info
Defendant
Kaylyn Vranich
Represented By
David C. Alford
Pakis, Giotes, Page & Burleson
contact info
Plaintiff
Hope Centric, LLC
Represented By
Zachary Thomas
contact info
MIchael Weems
Hughes Waters & Askanase, LLP
contact info
Gerogrio Flores
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, April 18, 2024
27 27 court Forms (F) (Adversary) Thu 04/18 4:02 PM
Exhibit Return Letter requested to Attorney Michael L. Weems, re: # 2, # 4 and # 7 (Hardage, Bridget) Response Received: Exhibits Destroyed. Modified on 4/19/2024 (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-]
26 26 court Forms (F) (Adversary) Thu 04/18 3:42 PM
Exhibit Return Letter requested to Attorney David Alford re: # 2, # 4 and # 7 (Hardage, Bridget) Received Response: Exhibits Destroyed. Modified on 4/18/2024 (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/21 9:25 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/08 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Application for Temporary Restraining Order as Moot (related document(s):4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Order entered on 3/6/2024)) Notice Date 03/08/2024. (Admin.
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/08 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Remanding Case (related document(s):7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #(3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt) (Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 .) (Order entered on 3/6/2024)
Thursday, March 07, 2024
23 23 court Event with PDF (Public) Thu 03/07 8:53 AM
Court Entry: A Certified Copy of Order Remanding State Court Action was mailed, First Class, to Bell County Justice Court, 146th Judicial District Court, P.O. Box 324, Belton, Texas 76513, Bell County, Texas (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
22 22 order Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) (PDF/pdf) Wed 03/06 4:56 PM
Order Dismissing Application for Temporary Restraining Order as Moot Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Order entered on 3/6/2024) (Hardage, Bridget
21 21 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 03/06 4:25 PM
Order Remanding Case Related [+] (Order entered on 3/6/2024) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #(3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt) (Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 .
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
20 20 court Exhibit Index and Witness List Tue 03/05 11:52 AM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing Held on 03/05/2024 Related [+](Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 .,7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 .) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 2 Debtor's Notice of Removal filed by David C. Alford for Defendants Love Out Loud, LLC, Debra L. Trujillo, Kaylyn Vranich Against Hope Centric, LLC,4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt
court Hearing Held Tue 03/05 11:55 AM
Hearing Held: Status Hearing Held-No Further Action . Related [+] (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 2 Debtor's Notice of Removal filed by David C. Alford for Defendants Love Out Loud, LLC, Debra L. Trujillo, Kaylyn Vranich Against Hope Centric, LLC
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 03/05 11:57 AM
Hearing Held: Dismissed as Moot-Order to come from Court . . Related [+](Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 .) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 03/05 11:58 AM
Hearing Held: Granted-Order to come from Mchael Weems to be remanded back to State Court . . Related [+] Order due by 3/19/2024 (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #(3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt) (Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 .
Monday, March 04, 2024
19 19 misc Brief/Memorandum (Adversary) Mon 03/04 3:38 PM
Brief/Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Hope Centric LLC's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by David C. Alford for Defendant Love Out Loud, LLC (Alford, David) Related [+]
Related: [-] 18 Response Filed by David C. Alford for Defendant Love Out Loud, LLC. (Alford, David) (related document(s):4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt)(Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024.
18 18 ans Response (Adversary) Mon 03/04 1:22 PM
Response Filed by David C. Alford for Defendant Love Out Loud, LLC. (Alford, David) Related [+](Weems, Michael)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt
Sunday, March 03, 2024
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Sun 03/03 7:11 PM
Judge's Notice, Permitting Eric Terry Appearance at hearing on 03/05/2024, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Prior to the Hearing starting ALL PARTIES DIALING INTO WEBEX WILL BE MOVED TO A BREAKOUT SESSION WHERE YOU WILL REMAIN UNTIL YOUR CASE IS CALLED AT WHICH TIME YOU WILL BE MOVED BACK INTO THE LIVE COURT HEARING. Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Castleberry, Deanna
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Sun 03/03 10:24 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: Eric Terry, Reason: minimize costs, ) (Date and Time of Hearing: 3/5/24 at 10 am) filed by Eric Terry for Interested Party Eric Terry. (Terry, Eric) Related [+](Weems, Michael)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt
Saturday, March 02, 2024
17 17 misc ~Document (Adversary) Sat 03/02 2:55 PM
Debtor's Amended Witness and Exhibit List (Plaintiff's Emerg. Appl. for TRO) filed by David C. Alford for Defendant Love Out Loud, LLC (Alford, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 ans Response (Adversary) Sat 03/02 1:27 PM
Response Filed by David C. Alford for Defendant Love Out Loud, LLC. (Alford, David) Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #(3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt) (Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024.
Att: 1 Exhibit National Autistic Society
Friday, March 01, 2024
15 15 misc Notice of Hearing Fri 03/01 11:53 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) Related [+](Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024.,7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt
Thursday, February 29, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/29 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting (related document(s):8 Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (related document(s):7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand Filed by Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) (Order entered on 2/27/2024)) Notice Date 02/29/2024. (Admin.
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/29 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Order Granting (related document(s):6 Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (related document(s):4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Order entered on 2/27/2024)) Notice Date 02/29/2024. (Admin.
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/28 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Status Hearing (related document(s):2 Debtor's Notice of Removal filed by David C. Alford for Defendants Love Out Loud, LLC, Debra L. Trujillo, Kaylyn Vranich). Against Hope Centric, LLC Status Hearing set for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. (Order entered on 2/26/2024)
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
11 11 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 02/27 11:36 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet filed by David C. Alford for Defendant Love Out Loud, LLC (Alford, David) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-06009 Case Information- Notice of Removal - Love Out Loud, LLC, Debra L. Trujillo, Kaylyn Vranich, against Hope Centric, LLC, ( Filing Fee: $ 350.00 ) (Nature(s) of Suit: (Nature(s) of Suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause), 14 (Recovery of money/property - other), 72 (Injunctive relief - other) (Alford, David). Related document(s)2 Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Debra L. Trujillo, Defendant Love Out Loud, LLC, Defendant Kaylyn Vranich. Modified on 2/27/2024 (Added linkage).
10 10 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 02/27 9:25 AM
Order Granting Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (related document(s):7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand Filed by Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) (Order entered on 2/27/2024) (Hardage, Bridget
9 9 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 02/27 9:25 AM
Order Granting Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (related document(s):4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Order entered on 2/27/2024) (Hardage, Bridget
court Hearing WA-TVC-MMP (NO FORM) Adversary Tue 02/27 5:35 AM
EXPEDITED Televideo Conference Hearing : (1.) ANY EXHIBIT WHICH THE PARTIES MAY WANT THE COURT TO CONSIDER MUST BE MAILED TO THE COURTROOM DEPUTY SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE HEARING... MAIL EXHIBITS TO U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT, ATTN: DEANNA CASTLEBERRY, 615 E. HOUSTON ST., SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS 78205... Hearing To Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. Hearing Scheduled For 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at Waco Bankruptcy Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SET ON EXPEDITED BASIS - MR. WEEMS SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
court Hearing WA-TVC-MMP (NO FORM) Adversary Tue 02/27 5:37 AM
EXPEDITED Televideo Conference Hearing : (1.) ANY EXHIBIT WHICH THE PARTIES MAY WANT THE COURT TO CONSIDER MUST BE MAILED TO THE COURTROOM DEPUTY SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE HEARING... MAIL EXHIBITS TO U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT, ATTN: DEANNA CASTLEBERRY, 615 E. HOUSTON ST., SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS 78205... Hearing To Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. Hearing Scheduled For 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at Waco Bankruptcy Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SET ON EXPEDITED BASIS - MR. WEEMS SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 motion Expedite Hearing (Adversary) Mon 02/26 3:15 PM
Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Proposed Order #(2) Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #(3) Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt) (Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 (Castleberry, Deanna)
7 7 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Mon 02/26 3:13 PM
Emergency Motion for Permissive Abstention and Equitable Remand (WITH 21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Expedite Hearing (Adversary) Mon 02/26 3:04 PM
Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3 Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #4 Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #5 Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #6 Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #7 Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt) Modified on 2/27/2024 (Castleberry, Deanna)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 02/26 3:01 PM
Exhibit and Witness List (Exhibit's A - F) filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Weems, Michael) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement1 #3 Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #4 Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #5 Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #6 Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #7 Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt) Modified on 2/27/2024 (Castleberry, Deanna)
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 02/26 2:57 PM
Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Michael L. Weems for Plaintiff Hope Centric, LLC. Exhibit B - Petition and Application for TRO v3 #(4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Hearing State Court #(5) Exhibit D - State Court Injunction #(6) Exhibit E - Bond Receipt #(7) Exhibit F - Furniture Receipt)(Weems, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2024 (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
3 3 order AP-Status Hearing (F) Mon 02/26 1:31 PM
Order for Status Hearing Related [+]. Against Hope Centric, LLC Status Hearing set for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. (Order entered on 2/26/2024) (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 2 Debtor's Notice of Removal filed by David C. Alford for Defendants Love Out Loud, LLC, Debra L. Trujillo, Kaylyn Vranich
Friday, February 23, 2024
2 2 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 02/23 4:33 PM
Debtor's Notice of Removal filed by David C. Alford for Plaintiffs Love Out Loud, LLC, Against Hope Centric, LLC Debra L. Trujillo, Kaylyn Vranich (Alford, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 02/23 4:25 PM
Adversary case 24-06009 Case Information- Notice of Removal - Love Out Loud, LLC, Debra L. Trujillo, Kaylyn Vranich against Hope Centric, LLC ( Filing Fee: $ 350.00 ) (Nature(s) of Suit:(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Alford, David)
Related: [-]