Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-11662

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-ap-50020
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cameron Lawrence
Represented By
Cameron Lawrence
contact info
Defendant
GNC Holdings, LLC, Counter Defendant
Represented By
GNC Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
John Doe
contact info
Defendant
ABC COMPANY
Represented By
ABC COMPANY
contact info
Defendant
GREGORY BERUBE
Represented By
GREGORY BERUBE
contact info
Defendant
Evercore Inc.
Represented By
Evercore Inc.
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT F. MORAN
Represented By
ROBERT F. MORAN
contact info
Defendant
MICHELE S. MEYER
Represented By
MICHELE S. MEYER
contact info
Defendant
PHILIP E. MALLOTT
Represented By
PHILIP E. MALLOTT
contact info
Defendant
Amy B. Lane
Represented By
Amy B. Lane
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL F. HINES
Represented By
MICHAEL F. HINES
contact info
Defendant
ALAN D. FELDMAN
Represented By
ALAN D. FELDMAN
contact info
Defendant
Susan M. Canning
Represented By
Susan M. Canning
contact info
Defendant
Tricia K. Tolivar
Represented By
Tricia K. Tolivar
contact info
Defendant
KENNETH A. MARTINDALE
Represented By
KENNETH A. MARTINDALE
contact info
Defendant
Hans Allegaert
Represented By
Hans Allegaert
contact info
Defendant
YONG KAI WONG
Represented By
YONG KAI WONG
contact info
Defendant
YICHEN ZHANG
Represented By
YICHEN ZHANG
contact info
Defendant
ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC
Represented By
ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC
contact info
Defendant
CITIC Capital Partners LLC
Represented By
CITIC Capital Partners LLC
contact info
Defendant
CITIC Limited
Represented By
CITIC Limited
contact info
Defendant
CITIC Capital Holdings Ltd.
Represented By
CITIC Capital Holdings Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
FARIS AL KOOHEJI
Represented By
FARIS AL KOOHEJI
contact info
Plaintiff
John Young Tang
TANG PC 655 SUMMIT AVE
HACKENSACK, NJ 07601
Represented By
John Young Tang
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
32 32 notice Withdrawal - Notice Fri 01/10 2:07 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Motions of Stefania D. Venezia and Nathan J. Montalto Related [+] Filed by GREGORY BERUBE, Evercore Inc. (Aronstam, Bradley)
Related: [-] 25 ,26
31 31 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 01/10 8:00 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Nathan J. Montalto, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 1/10/2025. (CB)
Related: [-] 29
30 30 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 01/10 7:59 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Stefania D. Venezia, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 1/10/2025. (CB)
Related: [-] 28
Thursday, January 09, 2025
29 29 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 01/09 3:52 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nathan J. Montalto . Receipt Number 4586426, Filed by GREGORY BERUBE, Evercore Inc.. (Aronstam, Bradley)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 01/09 3:49 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Stefania D. Venezia . Receipt Number 4586426, Filed by GREGORY BERUBE, Evercore Inc.. (Aronstam, Bradley)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/09 1:31 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of John A. Neuwirth, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 1/9/2025. (CB)
Related: [-] 24
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 01/09 1:25 PM
(Withdrawn)Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nathan J. Montalto . Receipt Number 4586426, Filed by GREGORY BERUBE, Evercore Inc.. (Aronstam, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2025 (Hollis, Cheryl). Modified on 1/9/2025 (Hollis, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 01/09 1:21 PM
(Withdrawn)Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Stefania D. Venezia . Receipt Number 4586426, Filed by GREGORY BERUBE, Evercore Inc.. (Aronstam, Bradley) Modified on 1/9/2025 (Hollis, Cheryl). Modified on 1/9/2025 (Hollis, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 01/09 12:30 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John A. Neuwirth . Receipt Number 4586426, Filed by GREGORY BERUBE, Evercore Inc.. (Aronstam, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
23 23 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 01/07 4:46 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by GREGORY BERUBE, Evercore Inc. (Aronstam, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
22 22 notice Docketing - Notice Wed 12/18 8:39 AM
Notice of Docketing Withdrawal of Reference by District Court. C.A. Case No. 24-1376 Tickle due by: 3/18/2025 to review any DC action. Related [+] (KAR)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 court Transmittal (Withdrawal of Reference) Mon 12/16 2:54 PM
Transmittal of Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the United States District Court (KAR) Modified on 12/16/2024 (KAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for withdrawal of reference D.I.#18 (2) Opening Brief filing in support of motion D.I. #20
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 misc Brief Fri 12/13 3:52 PM
Brief Opening Brief in Support of the Motion of John Yong Tang and Faris Al Kooheji, on Behalf of Themselves and Others Similarly Situated for Withdrawal of the Reference Related [+] Filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, John Young Tang. (Loizides, Christopher)
Related: [-] 18
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "1" to brief (SDNY Complaint)
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
19 19 crditcrd none Fri 12/13 3:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference (A)([LINK 24-50020 KBO] ) [motion,mwdrefad] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A11938609, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs motion Withdrawal of Reference - Motion (ap) Fri 12/13 3:46 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Motion of John Yong Tang and Faris Al Kooheji, on Behalf of Themselves and Others Similarly Situated for Withdrawal of the Reference . Fee Amount $199. Filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, John Young Tang Related [+]. (Loizides, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
17 17 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 10/01 3:33 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Wenjie Cai, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 10/1/2024. (Mml)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 10/01 3:21 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of John Yong Tang, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 10/1/2024. (Mml)
Related: [-] 14
Sunday, September 29, 2024
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Sun 09/29 1:21 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Wenjie Cai . Receipt Number 4510627, Filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, John Young Tang. (Loizides, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Sun 09/29 1:19 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for John Yong Tang . Receipt Number 4510627, Filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, John Young Tang. (Loizides, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 09/09 1:49 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, John Young Tang (Loizides, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Mon 09/09 1:54 PM
Attorney Christopher Dean Loizides and Christopher Dean Loizides for FARIS AL KOOHEJI and John Young Tang, John Young Tang and Christopher Dean Loizides for FARIS AL KOOHEJI and John Young Tang added to case Filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, John Young Tang. (Loizides, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/09 11:53 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Michael J. Reiss, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 4/9/2024. (CB)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/09 11:52 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Zachary F. Proulx, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 4/9/2024. (CB)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 04/09 11:36 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael J. Reiss, of Latham & Watkins LLP . Receipt Number 4380355, Filed by Susan M. Canning, ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, Amy B. Lane, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, Tricia K. Tolivar. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 04/09 11:34 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Zachary F. Proulx, of Latham & Watkins LLP . Receipt Number 4380355, Filed by Susan M. Canning, ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, Amy B. Lane, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, Tricia K. Tolivar. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 03/15 2:03 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Susan M. Canning, ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, Amy B. Lane, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, Tricia K. Tolivar (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Fri 03/15 2:09 PM
Attorney Zachary F. Proulx and Kara Hammond Coyle for MICHAEL F. HINES; Amy B. Lane; PHILIP E. MALLOTT; KENNETH A. MARTINDALE; MICHELE S. MEYER; ROBERT F. MORAN; Tricia K. Tolivar; Susan M. Canning and ALAN D. FELDMAN, Michael J. Reiss and Kara Hammond Coyle for MICHAEL F. HINES; Amy B. Lane; PHILIP E. MALLOTT; KENNETH A. MARTINDALE; MICHELE S. MEYER; ROBERT F. MORAN; Tricia K. Tolivar; Susan M. Canning and ALAN D. FELDMAN added to case Filed by Susan M. Canning, ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, Amy B. Lane, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, Tricia K. Tolivar. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 03/07 3:01 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Joseph Simpson, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 3/7/2024. (CB)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 03/07 3:00 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Nicole H. Sprinzen, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 3/7/2024. (CB)
Related: [-] 4
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 03/07 2:40 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Joseph Simpson . Receipt Number 4356176, Filed by Hans Allegaert, CITIC Capital Partners LLC, GNC Holdings, LLC, Cameron Lawrence, ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 03/07 2:39 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nicole H. Sprinzen . Receipt Number 4356176, Filed by Hans Allegaert, CITIC Capital Partners LLC, GNC Holdings, LLC, Cameron Lawrence, ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 03/07 2:22 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Hans Allegaert, CITIC Capital Partners LLC, GNC Holdings, LLC, Cameron Lawrence, ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 03/07 2:27 PM
Attorney NICOLE H. SPRINZEN and Simon E. Fraser for GNC Holdings, LLC; Cameron Lawrence; ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC; Hans Allegaert and CITIC Capital Partners LLC, Joseph Simpson and Simon E. Fraser for GNC Holdings, LLC; Cameron Lawrence; ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC; Hans Allegaert and CITIC Capital Partners LLC added to case Filed by Hans Allegaert, CITIC Capital Partners LLC, GNC Holdings, LLC, Cameron Lawrence, ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC. (Fraser, Simon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
2 2 notice Docketing - Notice Thu 02/29 12:51 PM
Notice of Docketing, Copy of Docket from DE District Court Case no. 24-cv-00198 . Tickle due by: 5/29/2024. Related [+] (KAR)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
1 1 1 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 02/27 1:32 PM
Adversary case 24-50020 [REFERRED TO US BANKRUPTCY COURT, DISTRICT OF DELAWARE] Complaint by John Young Tang, FARIS AL KOOHEJI against CITIC Capital Holdings Ltd., CITIC Limited, CITIC Capital Partners LLC, ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC, YICHEN ZHANG, YONG KAI WONG, Hans Allegaert, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, Tricia K. Tolivar, Cameron Lawrence, Susan M. Canning, ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, Amy B. Lane, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, Evercore Inc., GREGORY BERUBE, ABC COMPANY, John Doe, GNC Holdings, LLC. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)). (LBr) Modified on 2/27/2024 (LBr)
Related: [-]