Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03007
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
At Your Disposal, Inc.
2050 Demode Road
Holly, MI 48442
Represented By
At Your Disposal, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcorcan
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, July 29, 2024
10 10 court Copy of Mon 07/29 1:39 PM
Copy of: Order Approving Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Approval to Compromise Various Preference Claims of the Estate (Filed in Bankruptcy) (KEC)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 07/29 2:23 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3007 : Settled. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/29 2:26 PM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3007 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 audio . Wed 05/29 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/29/2024 9:41:55 AM ]. File Size [ 1200 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:30 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Order to Show Cause Dissolved Wed 05/29 9:47 AM
Minute Entry. Order to Show Cause Dissolved. Case has Settled. Related [+] (JAM)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case
Saturday, May 18, 2024
8 8 order Show Cause for Dismissal of Case Mon 05/20 9:13 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Progress and Prosecution. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/29/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/04 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/01 10:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of At Your Disposal, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 5/15/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
5 5 order stipulated order Wed 03/20 11:01 AM
Order Extending Answer Deadline Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcorcan
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 misc Stipulation Tue 03/19 12:54 PM
Stipulation By and Between Samuel D. Sweet and Michael James Re: Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint until April 30, 2024 . Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcorcan. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/29 8:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on At Your Disposal, Inc. 2/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 02/28 12:53 PM
Summons Issued on At Your Disposal, Inc. Answer Due 03/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 12:53 PM
Adversary case 24-03007 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcorcan against At Your Disposal, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transfers