Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:23-bk-30135
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Aug 07, 2023
Claims Deadline:Oct 16, 2023
Converted:Apr 26, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hi-Point Construction Co
16120 Silvercrest
Fenton, MI 48430
Represented By
Zachary R. Tucker
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richardo I. Kilpatrick
Kilpatrick & Asoociates, P.C. 903 N. Opdyke Rd. Suite C
Auburn Hills, MI 48326
Trustee
Collene K. Corcoran
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Andrew R. Vara
Represented By
Ronna G. Jackson
United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:49 AM EDT
Friday, January 20, 2023
crditcrd none Fri 01/20 10:48 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-30135 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A40134574, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
trustee UST Notice of Appearance Fri 01/20 4:57 PM
United States Trustee Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Andrew R. Vara. (Jackson, Ronna)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 01/20 10:41 AM
Chapter 11 SubChapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Hi-Point Construction Co Credit Counseling Certificate Due: 02/3/2023. Schedule A/B due 02/3/2023. Schedule D due 02/3/2023. Schedule E/F due 02/3/2023. Schedule G due 02/3/2023. Schedule H due 02/3/2023. Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) due 02/3/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/3/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 02/3/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 02/3/2023. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan due by 04/20/2023. (Tucker, Zachary)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Fri 01/20 10:41 AM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Hi-Point Construction Co. (Tucker, Zachary)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 01/20 10:41 AM
Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession Hi-Point Construction Co. (Tucker, Zachary)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 01/20 10:41 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Hi-Point Construction Co. (Tucker, Zachary)
Related: [-]