Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03008
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
AXLE Construction, LLC
14155 Seymour Road
Linden, MI 48451
Represented By
AXLE Construction, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcorcan
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, July 29, 2024
14 14 misc Garnishee Disclosure Mon 07/29 1:47 PM
Garnishee Disclosure Re: Filed by Genisys Credit Union. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
13 13 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Fri 07/19 12:57 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Genisys Credit Union (tmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 order Striking Document (text) Tue 07/02 1:09 PM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because of the misuse of the generic event, the court does not grant such a motion. The Clerk's Office will issue a Writ of Garnishment without a motion being filed. Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Joel D. Applebaum (KHM)
Related: [-] Generic Application11 Generic Application filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 motion generic Application Mon 07/01 6:22 PM
Application and Writ of Garnishment Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran (Beadle, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/01 5:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Special Counsel Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran. (Beadle, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/16 9:38 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran Related [+]. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, April 15, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Default Judgment Mon 04/15 12:56 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant, Axle Construction, LLC Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 misc Notice/Affidavit of Default Mon 04/15 11:05 AM
Notice/Affidavit of Default Plaintiff Collene Corcoran Related [+]. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment
6 6 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/15 11:04 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 04/15 12:56 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3008 : Granted by Default Judgment. (jmk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/15 12:57 PM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3008 Closed. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/05 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/02 9:37 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of AXLE Construction, LLC - Default Judgment Motion due by 4/16/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/29 8:40 AM
Summons Service Executed on AXLE Construction, LLC 2/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 02/28 1:24 PM
Summons Issued on AXLE Construction, LLC Answer Due 03/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 1:24 PM
Adversary case 24-03008 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcorcan against AXLE Construction, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transfers