Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03010
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:May 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.
8300 Dexter-Chelsea Road
Dexter, MI 48130
Represented By
Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcorcan
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, May 20, 2024
17 17 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Mon 05/20 10:17 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 5/17/2024, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Joel D. Applebaum. (KEC)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Copy of Mon 05/20 10:00 AM
Copy of: Order Approving Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Approval to Compromise Various Preference Claims of the Estate (Entered in Bankruptcy Case) (KEC)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 05/20 10:17 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3010 : Dismissed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/20 10:18 AM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3010 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/26 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Deficiency Notice (BK)
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 court Deficiency Notice (BK) Tue 04/23 10:48 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 4/30/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 13 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Defendant Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/22 7:40 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership and proof of service Filed by Defendant Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.. (Morris, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/22 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Deficiency Notice
Friday, April 19, 2024
11 11 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Fri 04/19 9:09 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Related [+] Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 4/26/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
10 10 audio . Wed 04/03 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/3/2024 11:11:40 AM ]. File Size [ 2400 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:00 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Matter Settled Wed 04/03 11:22 AM
Minute Entry. Matter Settled. Related [+] (JAM)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/07 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/07 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Deficiency Notice
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/04 2:44 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Cribley Drilling Company, Inc. Related [+]. (Morris, Thomas)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint
6 6 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 03/04 1:31 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Missing. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 3/11/2024. (jmk)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.
5 5 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Mon 03/04 9:15 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 4/3/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM)--- NOTE: effective beginning March 16, 2020, Judge Applebaum is conducting all conferences and non evidentiary hearings by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for such a hearing, counsel and parties should call (202) 503-1666 and use conference ID 969 654 90#. Counsel and parties should place their phone on mute and wait until their case is called before unmuting their phone and participating. Under no circumstance is a party or their counsel to place their phone on hold. (This procedure does not apply to Chapter 13 status conferences with the Chapter 13 Trustee. See any applicable notices by the Chapter 13 Trustee for information about status conferences.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/01 11:04 AM
Answer to Complaint proof of service not required F.R.Bankr.P. 7005; F.R.Civ.P 5(d)(1)(B) Filed by Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.. (Morris, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/29 8:47 AM
Summons Service Executed on Cribley Drilling Company, Inc. 2/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 02/28 4:16 PM
Summons Issued on Cribley Drilling Company, Inc. Answer Due 03/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 4:16 PM
Adversary case 24-03010 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcorcan against Cribley Drilling Company, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cribley Drilling Company Transfers